This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2018 at 07:01:48 (UTC).

Viktor v. Lamar et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Viktor filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Lamar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine B. Forrest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01554

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine B. Forrest

 

Party Details

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider and Plaintiff

Lina Iris Viktor

Defendants

Solana Imani Rowe

Interscope Records

Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc.

Freenjoy, Inc.

Kendrick Lamar Duckworth

Buf, Inc.

RadicalMedia LLC

Top Dawg Entertainment LLC

Dave Meyer

John Does

Kendrick Lamar

Dave Free

Dave Meyers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider and Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher J. Robinson

Attorney at Cahill Cossu Noh & Robinson LLP

70 West 40Th Street 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10018

Defendant Attorneys

Robert A. Jacobs

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP(TimesSq)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Chelsea Sandra Stevens

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP (NYC)

599 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022-6030

Matthew Busch

Attorney at Venable LLP (LA)

2049 Century Park East, Ste. 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William J. Briggs, II

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2906

 

Court Documents

#71

#70

69 #3

Text of Proposed Order

69 #2

Exhibit A

69 #1

Affidavit of Matthew J. Busch

#69

68 #3

Text of Proposed Order

68 #2

Exhibit A

68 #1

Affidavit of William J. Briggs

#68

66 #3

Text of Proposed Order

66 #2

Exhibit A

#66

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Copyright Registrations

#1

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MATTHEW J. BUSCH granting #69 Motion for Matthew J. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/13/2018) (anc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF WILLIAM J. BRIGGS, II granting #68 Motion for William J. Briggs, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/13/2018) (anc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #69 MOTION for Matthew J. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice , receipt number 0208-14930595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #68 MOTION for William J. Briggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice , receipt number 0208-14930429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The documents have been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) MOTION for Matthew J. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice , receipt number 0208-14930595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew J. Busch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Busch, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MOTION for William J. Briggs to Appear Pro Hac Vice , receipt number 0208-14930429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William J. Briggs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, William) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #66 MOTION for William J. Briggs, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #67 MOTION for Matthew J. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Matthew J. Busch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930595. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew J. Busch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Busch, Matthew) Modified on 4/12/2018 (wb). (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William J. Briggs, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14930429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Buf, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William J. Briggs, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Briggs, William) Modified on 4/12/2018 (wb). (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) ORDER granting #63 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #63 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 1. The court grants the application to extend the time to move/answer to 5/18/18. 2. The initial conference is adjourned to 5/23/18 at 11 am. (Initial Conference set for 5/23/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) Dave Free answer due 5/18/2018; Interscope Records answer due 5/18/2018; Kendrick Lamar answer due 5/18/2018; Solana Imani Rowe answer due 5/18/2018; Top Dawg Entertainment LLC answer due 5/18/2018; Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc. answer due 5/18/2018. Buf Inc. Answer due 5/18/2018. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/5/2018) (cf) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT, Plaintiff Lina Iris Viktor, by her undersigned counsel, hereby dismisses without prejudice all claims asserted in the First Amended Complaint against Defendant RadicalMedia LLC only, pursuant to the provisions of Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff maintains her claims against all other defendants. SO ORDERED., RadicalMedia LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 4/03/2018) (ama) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Christopher J. Robinson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:101 Copyright Infringement; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 17:501 Copyright Infringement; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher J. Robinson to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading( Dave Free, John Does 1-8) were not entered on CM ECF; not all the party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher J. Robinson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lina Iris Viktor, Kendrick Lamar Duckworth, Top Dawg Entertainment LLC, Interscope Records, Solana Imani Rowe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly; party name entered incorrectly. (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Christopher J. Robinson. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc. The party was added to the case in error. (vf) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KENDRICK LAMAR, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lina Iris Viktor. (Robinson, Christopher) Modified on 2/21/2018 (vf). (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Robinson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERRORCOMPLAINT against Buf, Inc., Kendrick Lamar Duckworth, Freenjoy, Inc., Interscope Records, Dave Meyer, RadicalMedia LLC, Solana Imani Rowe, Top Dawg Entertainment LLC, Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14721712)Document filed by Lina Iris Viktor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registrations)(Robinson, Christopher) Modified on 2/21/2018 (vf). (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RADICALMEDIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FREENJOY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher John Robinson