This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:38:53 (UTC).

United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements, Located at 210 Drake Drive, Rochester, New York, That Is, All That Tract or Parcel of Land, Situated in the Town of Irondequoit, County of

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against The Premises and Real Property with All Buildings, Appurtenances, and Improvements, Located at 210 Drake Drive, Rochester, New York, That Is, All That Tract or Parcel of Land, Situated in the Town of Irondequoit, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles J. Siragusa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06569

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles J. Siragusa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Judy Perkins

Rochester, NY 14609

Bernard Perkins

Joshua Perkins

Rochester, NY 14609

Defendant

THE PREMISES AND REAL PROPERTY WITH ALL BUILDINGS, APPURTENANCES, AND IMPROVEMENTS, LOCATED AT 210 DRAKE DRIVE, ROCHESTER, NEW YORK, THAT IS, ALL THAT TRACT OR PARCEL OF LAND, SITUATED IN THE TOWN OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grace M. Carducci

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

100 State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Claimant Attorney

Craig D. Chartier

Attorney at Dibble & Miller, P.C.

55 Canterbury Road

Rochester, NY 14607-3436

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 12, 2018. (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#10

(#10) RESTRAINING ORDER granting #5 Motion. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/12/2018. (BK) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Bernard Perkins answer due 11/16/2018. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/10/18. (KAP) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#7

(#7) CLAIM Notice of Claim by Joshua Perkins. (BK) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) CLAIM Notice of Claim by Judy Perkins. (BK) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION Notice of Motion for Entry of a Post-Complaint Restraining Order with Memorandum in Support by United States of America.(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#4

(#4) CLAIM Notice of Claim (Owner) by Bernard Perkins. (Chartier, Craig) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig D. Chartier on behalf of Bernard Perkins (Chartier, Craig) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

1 #2

Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE PREMISES AND REAL PROPERTY WITH ALL BUILDINGS, APPURTENANCES, AND IMPROVEMENTS, LOCATED AT 210 DRAKE DRIVE, ROCHESTER, NEW YORK, THAT IS, ALL THAT TRACT OR PARCEL OF LAND, SITUATED IN THE TOWN OF, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 12, 2018. (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESTRAINING ORDER granting #5 Motion. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/12/2018. (BK) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Bernard Perkins answer due 11/16/2018. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/10/18. (KAP) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLAIM Notice of Claim by Joshua Perkins. (BK) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM Notice of Claim by Judy Perkins. (BK) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Notice of Motion for Entry of a Post-Complaint Restraining Order with Memorandum in Support by United States of America.(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLAIM Notice of Claim (Owner) by Bernard Perkins. (Chartier, Craig) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig D. Chartier on behalf of Bernard Perkins (Chartier, Craig) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THE PREMISES AND REAL PROPERTY WITH ALL BUILDINGS, APPURTENANCES, AND IMPROVEMENTS, LOCATED AT 210 DRAKE DRIVE, ROCHESTER, NEW YORK, THAT IS, ALL THAT TRACT OR PARCEL OF LAND, SITUATED IN THE TOWN OF, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property)(Carducci, Grace) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less