This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/09/2018 at 07:13:24 (UTC).

Schumacher v. Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Schumacher filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Holly L. Teeter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04130

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Schumacher

Defendants

Paxton Hardwoods, LLC

Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP

FPL Properties, LLC

Troy Higgs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Scott Diehl

Attorney at Ralston, Pope & Diehl LLC

2913 S.W. Maupin Lane

Topeka, KS 66614

Ronald P. Pope

Attorney at Ralston, Pope & Diehl LLC

2913 S.W. Maupin Lane

Topeka, KS 66614

Thomas B. Diehl

Attorney at Ralston, Pope & Diehl LLC

2913 S.W. Maupin Lane

Topeka, KS 66614

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin D. Weakley

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 West 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Robyn M. Butler

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 West 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (attorney) . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robyn M. Butler on behalf of All Defendants. (Butler, Robyn) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP, Troy Higgs, Paxton Hardwoods, LLC(Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP, Troy Higgs, Paxton Hardwoods, LLC (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP identifying Hardwoods Specialty Products USGP, Inc. and Hardwoods Specialty Products Corp. as corporate parent . (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paxton Hardwoods, LLC identifying Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP as corporate parent . (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin D. Weakley on behalf of All Defendants. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Charles Schumacher as to Defendant FPL Properties, LLC (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Charles Schumacher upon Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018 (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Charles Schumacher upon Paxton Hardwoods, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018 (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Charles Schumacher upon Paxton Hardwoods, LLC served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Charles Schumacher upon Troy Higgs served on 11/3/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to FPL Properties, LLC, Hardwoods Specialty Products, US, LP, Troy Higgs, Paxton Hardwoods, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (msb) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Charles Schumacher. (Diehl, Gregory) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (msb). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AMENDED DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Charles Schumacher - trial to be held in Topeka. (Diehl, Gregory) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (msb). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Charles Schumacher. (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL (titled Plaintiff's Jury Demand) filed by Plaintiff Charles Schumacher - trial to be held in Topeka. (Diehl, Gregory) Modified text on 10/11/2018 (msb). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Charles Schumacher. (Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4604669.), filed by Charles Schumacher.(Diehl, Gregory) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARDWOOD SPECIALTY PRODUCTS US LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn M. Butler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin D. Weakley