This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:22:49 (UTC).

Acosta v. Peters et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Acosta filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Peters. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02933

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexander Acosta

R. Alexander Acosta

Defendants

Cedar Lane Senior Assisted Living Facility, Inc.

Ashleigh's Senior Assisted Living, Inc.

Frank Dickerson

International Health Care Consultants, Inc.

Lois Peters

International Health Care Consultants, Inc. doing business as IHCC doing business as Ashleigh's Place

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Avni J Amin

Attorney at U.S. Department Of Labor, Office of the Solicitor

201 12Th St. South, Suite 401

Arlington, VA 22202

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Ashleigh's Senior Assisted Living, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Cedar Lane Senior Assisted Living Facility, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. International Health Care Consultants, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Frank Dickerson waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Lois Peters waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amin, Avni) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Ashleigh's Senior Assisted Living, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Cedar Lane Senior Assisted Living Facility, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. International Health Care Consultants, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Frank Dickerson waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R. Alexander Acosta. Lois Peters waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018.(Luby, Andrea) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by R. Alexander Acosta. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link to #1 Complaint (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amin, Avni) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Avni Jayprakash Amin