This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 07:41:55 (UTC).

Norton Sound Health Corporation v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 Norton Sound Health Corporation filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

Norton Sound Health Corporation

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Anda, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mallinckrodt Plc

Henry Schein, Inc.

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Allergan Plc

Endo International Plc

Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Norton Sound Health Corporation

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Edmund Clay Goodman

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

Geoffrey D. Strommer

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

Dawn E. Winalski

Attorney at Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

516 Se Morrison Steet, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97214

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-62) - 10 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:18-cv-00243, 1 in AK/3:18-cv-00247, 2 in GAM/7:18-cv-00174, 2 in ILN/1:18-cv-06959, 1 in LAM/3:18-cv-00914, 1 in LAM/3:18-cv-00915, 2886 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in NCM/1:18-cv-00874, 1 in NCW/5:18-cv-00169, 1 in NM/2:18-cv-00959, 1 in SD/4:18-cv-04132) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedures to follow before filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/30/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Edmund Clay Goodman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2595830.) by Norton Sound Health Corporation.(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case by Norton Sound Health Corporation re #1 Complaint (Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2595818.), filed by Norton Sound Health Corporation.(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-62) - 10 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/3:18-cv-00243, 1 in AK/3:18-cv-00247, 2 in GAM/7:18-cv-00174, 2 in ILN/1:18-cv-06959, 1 in LAM/3:18-cv-00914, 1 in LAM/3:18-cv-00915, 2886 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in NCM/1:18-cv-00874, 1 in NCW/5:18-cv-00169, 1 in NM/2:18-cv-00959, 1 in SD/4:18-cv-04132) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • (#7) NOTICE this case is related to case 3:18-cv-00260-SLG, which is assigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason and case 3:18-cv-00243-JWS, which is assigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedures to follow before filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/30/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, at docket #4 , filed by Attorney Edmund Clay Goodman is GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Edmund Clay Goodman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2595830.) by Norton Sound Health Corporation.(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case by Norton Sound Health Corporation re #1 Complaint (Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2595818.), filed by Norton Sound Health Corporation.(Strommer, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.