This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:57:21 (UTC).

Dennis Ketterhagen v. Nestle USA Inc

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Dennis Ketterhagen filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Nestle USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01161

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Ketterhagen

Defendant

Nestle USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph J Welcenbach

Attorney at Welcenbach Law Offices

933 N Mayfair Rd - Ste 311

Milwaukee, WI 53226

Defendant Attorneys

Christine E Bestor Townsend

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

1243 N 10Th - Ste 200

Milwaukee, WI 53205

Bernard J Bobber

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

1243 N 10Th - Ste 200

Milwaukee, WI 53205

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Nestle USA Inc.(Bobber, Bernard)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E Bestor Townsend on behalf of Nestle USA Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christine Bestor Townsend and Bernard J. Bobber (Townsend, Christine)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Nestle USA Inc. (Townsend, Christine)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Welcenbach, Joseph)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nestle USA Inc from Racine County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-cv-001298 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2885922) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Townsend, Christine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 9/17/2018.(cc: all counsel)(mlm)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • NOTICE of Hearing: At the request of counsel, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 9:30 AM HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 10/9/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 10/3/2018.(cc: all counsel)(mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. The parties are to file their Rule 26(f) Report no later than 9/17/2018.(cc: all counsel)(mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nestle USA Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Townsend, Christine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Welcenbach, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed by September 7, 2018; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from Joseph J. Welcenbach . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Welcenbach, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Welcenbach, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Nestle USA Inc.(Bobber, Bernard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E Bestor Townsend on behalf of Nestle USA Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christine Bestor Townsend and Bernard J. Bobber (Townsend, Christine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Nestle USA Inc. (Townsend, Christine)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nestle USA Inc from Racine County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-cv-001298 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2885922) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Townsend, Christine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2018: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.