This case was last updated from PACER on 01/23/2018 at 07:17:56 (UTC).

Atticus Research Corporation v. MMSOFT Design Limited

Case Summary

On 11/06/2017 Atticus Research Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MMSOFT Design Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-03387

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atticus Research Corporation

Defendant

MMSOFT Design Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C Dale Quisenberry

Attorney at Polasek Quisenberry et al

6750 W Loop South, Ste 920

Bellaire, TX 77401

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle Joy Healey

Attorney at Fish Richardson PC

1221 Mckinney St, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77010

Lawrence K Kolodney

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

225 Franklin St

Boston, MA 02110

Matthew C Berntsen

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

One Marina Park Dr

Boston, MA 02210-1878

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Lawrence K. Kolodney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Matthew C. Berntsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Lawrence K. Kolodney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2017. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Matthew C. Berntsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2017. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed.(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Atticus Research Corporation, filed.(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MMSOFT Design Limited served on 11/21/2017, answer due 2/20/2018, filed.(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

#3

(#3) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MMSOFT Design Limited (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19165339) filed by Atticus Research Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Lawrence K. Kolodney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Matthew C. Berntsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Lawrence K. Kolodney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2017. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Matthew C. Berntsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/29/2017. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by MMSOFT Design Limited, filed.(Healey, David) (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Atticus Research Corporation, filed.(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MMSOFT Design Limited served on 11/21/2017, answer due 2/20/2018, filed.(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks, AO-120, Notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MMSOFT Design Limited (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19165339) filed by Atticus Research Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quisenberry, C) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence K. Kolodney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew C Berntsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle Joy Healey