Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:24:15 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL SALES ORGANIZATION, INC., v. METT PTY LTD

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 INTERNATIONAL SALES ORGANIZATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against METT PTY LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Steven Whalen and Sean F. Cox. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-13752

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

International Sales Organization, Inc.

Defendant

METT PTY LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Moheeb H. Murray

Attorney at Bush, Seyferth & Paige, PLLC

3001 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 600

Troy, MI 48084-3107

Joseph E. Viviano

Attorney at Kienbaum Hardy Viviano Pelton & Forrest, P.L.C.

48 S. Main Street, Suite 2

Mount Clemens, MI 48043

Michael J. Laramie

Attorney at Bush Seyferth Paig

Suite 600, 3001 W. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48084

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald E. Reynolds

Attorney at Vercruysse Murray, P.C.

31780 Telegraph Road, Suite 200

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

Louis S. Chronowski, Jr.

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Louis S. Chronowski, Jr on behalf of METT PTY LTD. (Chronowski, Louis) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance on Jury Demand by METT PTY LTD. (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by International Sales Organization, Inc. against METT PTY LTD. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Murray, Moheeb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Murray, Moheeb) Modified on 12/19/2018 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED] (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER Withdrawing Viviano, Pagano & Howlett, PLLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION to the withdrawal of Viviano, Pagano & Howlett PLLC by International Sales Organization, Inc. (Viviano, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by METT PTY LTD. (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Laramie on behalf of International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Laramie, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Moheeb H. Murray on behalf of International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Murray, Moheeb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by METT PTY LTD from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2018-3989-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7013872 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (EKar) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 1/15/2019 is Cancelled re #6 Notice to Appear (JMcC) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Louis S. Chronowski, Jr on behalf of METT PTY LTD. (Chronowski, Louis) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance on Jury Demand by METT PTY LTD. (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand filed by International Sales Organization, Inc. against METT PTY LTD. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Murray, Moheeb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Murray, Moheeb) Modified on 12/19/2018 (DWor). [WRONG EVENT SELECTED] (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Withdrawing Viviano, Pagano & Howlett, PLLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION to the withdrawal of Viviano, Pagano & Howlett PLLC by International Sales Organization, Inc. (Viviano, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by METT PTY LTD. (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Laramie on behalf of International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Laramie, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Moheeb H. Murray on behalf of International Sales Organization, Inc.. (Murray, Moheeb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by METT PTY LTD from Macomb County Circuit Court, case number 2018-3989-CB. Receipt No: 0645-7013872 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Addition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant International Sales Organization, Inc.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF (Reynolds, Ronald) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moheeb H. Murray