This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2018 at 07:42:54 (UTC).

Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Mayor and City Council of Baltimore filed a Property - Land lawsuit against BP P L C ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen L. Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02357

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen L. Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore

Defendants

Chevron Corp.

Phillips 66 Company

Consol Energy Inc.

BP America, Inc.

Royal Dutch Shell PLC

Citgo Petroleum Corp.

Consol Marine Terminals LLC

Crown Central LLC

Hess Corp.

Marathon Petroleum Corporation

ConocoPhillips Company

BP P.L.C.

ConocoPhillips

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

BP Products North America Inc.

Phillips 66

Louisiana Land & Exploration Co.

Crown Central Petroleum Corporation

CNX Resources Corporation

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Ryan Martinez

Attorney at Baltimore City Law Department

100 N Holliday St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Matthew K Edling

Attorney at Sher Edling LLP

100 Montgomery St. Ste. 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Andre M Davis

Attorney at Baltimore City Department Of Law

100 N. Holliday Street, Suite 101

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorneys

Tonya Kelly Cronin

Attorney at Rifkin Weiner Livingston LLC

2002 Clipper Park Road, Unit 108

Baltimore, MD 21211

Joshua S Lipshutz

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Tracy A Roman

Attorney at Crowell and Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Lisa S Meyer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Ave. Ste. 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Raphael Janove

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave.

Chicago, IL 60604

Michelle Nicole Lipkowitz

Attorney at Saul Ewing LLP

500 E Pratt St Eight Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

Jonathan R Siegel

Attorney at Wachtell Lipton Rosen and Katz

51 West 52Nd St.

New York, NY 10019

Michael Alan Brown

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scaborough LLP

100 South Charles Street, 12Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Leianne S McEvoy

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

100 S. Charles Street, 12Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21201

Lynn C Schlie

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

100 S. Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Margaret A Tough

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery St. Ste. 2000

San Francisco, CA 941111

Other Attorneys

Daniel Toal

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton and Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Craig A Thompson

Attorney at Venable LLP

750 E. Pratt Street, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

Ann Marie Mortimer

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope St. Ste. 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shannon S Broome

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

50 California St.

San Francisco, CA 94111

James M Webster, III

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.

1615 M St Nw Ste 400

Washington, DC 20036

Jaren Janghorbani

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton, and Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

111 #1

Memorandum in Support

#111

#108

#107

#106

#105

#98

#97

#96

#4

#3

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Sher, Victor) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #107 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven Bauer. Directing attorney Steven Bauer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #106 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Margaret Tough. Directing attorney Margaret Tough to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 (Su, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Mark Bauer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7551530.) by Phillips 66(Su, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Margaret A. Tough (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7551523.) by Phillips 66(Su, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Chunwei Su on behalf of Phillips 66 (Su, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #98 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raphael Janove. Directing attorney Raphael Janove to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #97 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lisa S Meyer. Directing attorney Lisa S Meyer to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pamela R Hanebutt. Directing attorney Pamela R Hanebutt to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 8/31/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Lipshutz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488561.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cronin, Tonya) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore Boutrous, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488552.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cronin, Tonya) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anne Champion (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7488536.) by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. Inc.(Cronin, Tonya) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 8/2/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Aron U Raskas on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Raskas, Aron) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Biran on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Biran, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya Kelly Cronin on behalf of Chevron Corp. (Cronin, Tonya) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Chevron Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cronin, Tonya) (Exhibit A - Complaint rec'd 8/2/2018 and FILED SEPARATELY) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-004219. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7477289), filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronin, Tonya) Modified on 8/2/2018 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less