This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2022 at 06:20:51 (UTC).

BAKER-NOTTER v. FREEDOM FORUM, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 BAKER-NOTTER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FREEDOM FORUM, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02499

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Baker-Notter

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant

FREEDOM FORUM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorneys

Monique Antonia Miles

Attorney at OLD TOWN ASSOCIATES, P.C.

216 South Patrick Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Danielle Grace Pimentel

Attorney at OLD TOWN ASSOCIATES, P.C.

216 South Patrick Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Ondeck

1300 I Street, Nw, Suite 825

Washington, DC 20005

Katherine C. Ondeck

Attorney at BAKER & HOSTETLER LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Shameka N. Bloyce

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Brian Adam Scotti

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Ryan M. Poteet

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by DONNA BAKER-NOTTER. (Miles, Monique) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#56

(#56) Joint STATUS REPORT by DONNA BAKER-NOTTER. (Miles, Monique) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#55

(#55) Joint STATUS REPORT by FREEDOM FORUM, INC.. (Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#54

(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Grace Pimentel on behalf of DONNA BAKER-NOTTER (Pimentel, Danielle) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#53

(#53) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/22/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

46 #21

Exhibit R

46 #20

Exhibit Q

46 #9

Exhibit F

46 #7

Exhibit D

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit A

#5

#4

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

233 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by DONNA BAKER-NOTTER. (Miles, Monique) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #56 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 21, 2022, if the matter has not been dismissed before then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/22/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Joint STATUS REPORT by DONNA BAKER-NOTTER. (Miles, Monique) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #55 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 22, 2022, if the matter has not been dismissed before then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Joint STATUS REPORT by FREEDOM FORUM, INC.. (Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Grace Pimentel on behalf of DONNA BAKER-NOTTER (Pimentel, Danielle) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Telephone Conference held on 4/22/2022. Parties consent to having this matter referred to the court's mediation program, and the court will issue a referral. If mediation is not successful, Jury Selection and Trial will commence on 3/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer.) (tj) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/22/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on April 22, 2022 at 10:30 am. Dial-in information has been provided to the parties by email. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/16/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part #46 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/15/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdication and Failure to State a Claim filed by FREEDOM FORUM, INC.. (Scotti, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdication and Failure to State a Claim filed by DONNA BAKER-NOTTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Miles, Monique) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Ondeck on behalf of FREEDOM FORUM, INC. (Ondeck, Katherine) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FREEDOM FORUM, INC. (Scotti, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdication and Failure to State a Claim by FREEDOM FORUM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scotti, Brian) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FREEDOM FORUM, INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018 (Miles, Monique) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FREEDOM FORUM, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by Donna Baker-Notter.(Miles, Monique) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FREEDOM FORUM, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5763951) filed by Donna Baker-Notter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miles, Monique) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique Antonia Miles