This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2018 at 12:34:53 (UTC).

Locust Ridge Plantation L L C v. A D C O Producing Co Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 Locust Ridge Plantation L L C filed a Property - Land lawsuit against A D C O Producing Co Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L Hayes and Robert G James. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00746

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

Presiding Judge

Robert G James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Locust Ridge Plantation L L C

E R McDonald & Sons Inc

Defendants

B P America Production Co

N H Wheless Oil Co

ConocoPhillips Co

Southern Natural Gas Co L L C

Arkoma Louisiana L L C

G & D Energy Inc

Marathon Petroleum Co L P

Odyseey 83-1 Ltd

J C Trahan Drilling Contractor Inc

Atlantic Richfield Co

Arkoma Development L L C

A D C O Producing Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian T Carmouche

William Robert Coenen, III

Victor L Marcello

Leah Cotten Poole

Caroline Hidalgo Martin

Donald T Carmouche

K Douglas Wheeler

John H Carmouche

Defendant Attorneys

George Arceneaux, III

Brian Wesley Capell

Brittan Jackson Bush

Michael J Cerniglia

Eric E Jarrell

Nicole M Babb

Tyler Ann Kostal

Richard Dean McConnell, Jr

Claire Elizabeth Juneau

John Durham Crigler, Jr

Wayne G Zeringue, Jr

Alida C Hainkel

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting 17 Motion to Remand and denying 17 Motion for Attorney Fees, costs and expenses. This matter is remanded to the Sixth Judicial District Court for the Parish of Tensas, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)

#36

(#36) MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Locust Ridge Plantation L L C, E R McDonald & Sons Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 12/6/2017 to correct signed by date (Crawford, A).

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting 17 Motion to Remand and denying 17 Motion for Attorney Fees, costs and expenses. This matter is remanded to the Sixth Judicial District Court for the Parish of Tensas, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Locust Ridge Plantation L L C, E R McDonald & Sons Inc. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 12/5/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 12/6/2017 to correct signed by date (Crawford, A).

    Read MoreRead Less