This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 13:10:43 (UTC).

Uzee et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Uzee filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Jane Triche Milazzo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-06856

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Atney R. Uzee

Philip A. Uzee

Denise A Uzee

Kathleen A. Uzee

Defendants and Cross Defendants

J. Melton Garrett

Owens-Illinois, Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Travelers Indemnity Company

American Motorists Insurance Company

Trinity Industries, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

American Employers Insurance Company

Continental Insurance Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle, Inc.

Lamorak Insurance Company

Albert L. Bossier, Jr.

Hopeman Brothers, Inc.

OneBeacon Insurance Company

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremiah S. Boling

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (Baton Rouge)

2600 Citiplace Drive, Suite 400

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol St., Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Adam Devlin deMahy

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Frances M. Montegut

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Amanda Marie Crowley Fraser

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mathilde Villere Semmes,

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Lacey Taylor McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

James H. Brown, Jr.

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Amy Louise Maccherone

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

36 #3

Exhibit 10

36 #2

Exhibit 9

#36

4 #7

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

4 #4

Exhibit 3

4 #3

Exhibit 2

#3

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle, Inc. (Oubre, Louis) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McCarty Corporation (Oubre, Louis) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand (Rec. Doc. #4 ) was argued by counsel and taken under submission by the Court. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sa) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER that oral argument previously set for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court is CONTINUED AND RESET for 9/12/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Further Ordered that this order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to the Cross-Claims of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (sa). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that oral argument previously set on the Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. #4 ) for August 29, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. is CONTINUED and RESET for September 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each party is limited to 7 minutes of argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall not be interpreted to alter the briefing deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 4). Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/21/2018.(sa) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10)(ecm) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #33 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect 'Order' on the actual document.** (sbs) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Proposed Order)(Colley, Christopher) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (sbs). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, and to the Third Party Demands of J. Melton Garrett and Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 7/27/2018 (sa). (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint Cross-Claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(Semmes, Mathilde) Modified text on 7/26/2018 (sa). (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Semmes, Mathilde) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mathilde Villere Semmes on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. Attorney Mathilde Villere Semmes added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Semmes, Mathilde) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Colley, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Denise A Uzee, Kathleen A. Uzee, Philip A. Uzee. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Notice of Submission)(Colley, Christopher) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (am) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 18-2770 E(16) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7013140) filed by Albert L. Bossier, Jr., Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Winter Trapolin added to party Lamorak Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Trapolin, Edward) Modified text on 7/23/2018 (am). (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MOTORISTSINSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPARTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TRINITY INDUSTRIES INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Lamorak Insurance Company is a litigant