This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 07:34:32 (UTC).

USOR Site PRP Group v. A&M Contractors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2014 USOR Site PRP Group filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against A M Contractors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M. Hoyt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02441

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M. Hoyt

 

Party Details

Defendants

League City, Texas

Lone Star Heat Treating Corp.

J&R Wastewater Services Inc., d/b/a J&R Services

Mztech, Inc.

KHSS Ventures, Inc.

6926 Spencer Hwy.

Pasadena, TX 77505

Advanced Environmental Services

Universal Compression Holdings, Inc.

American Tietek, LLC

Deposition Technology Inc.

Texas A&M University

Nucor Corp.

Houston Motor Speedway Corp.

Accurate Precision Plating LLC

Three Brothers Bakery, Inc

4036 S. Braeswood Blvd.

Houston, TX 77025

Safari Restaurant

Jeff's Kitchen, Meat Market and Smoke House

Polymer Chemistry Innovations, Inc.

Hoerbiger Service Inc.

Cut-Rate Vacuum Service, Inc.

United Crane

1,234 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael Keith Eaves

Attorney at Calvert Eaves Clarke Stelly LLP

2615 Calder Ave, Ste 1070

Beaumont, TX 77702

William J Collins, III

Attorney at Sheehy Ware Pappas

909 Fannin, Ste 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Geary Todd Taylor

Attorney at Johanson Fairless LLP

1456 First Colony Blvd

Sugar Land, TX 77479

Kevin Frank Risley

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

One Riverway, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77056

Robert Weinstock

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

One North Wacker Dr., Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

Elliot P Anderson

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy PC

321 S Boston Ave Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Alana Elizabeth Fortna

Attorney at Babst, Calland et al

Two Gateway Center, 603 Stanwix Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dale F Carrington

Attorney at Law Office of Dale F Carrington

4801 Woodway, Suite 165E

Houston, TX 77056

Jeffrey Civins

Attorney at Haynes Boone LLP

600 Congress Ave, Ste 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Gregory J Casas

Attorney at Greenberg Trauring LLP

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

John Louis Cordani, Jr.

Attorney at Carmody Torr Sandak Hennessey, LLP

195 Church St

New Haven, CT 06509

Charles O Grigson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

604 W 12Th Street

Austin, TX 78701

Kathleen A O'Connor

Attorney at O'ConnorWechsler, PLLC

4400 Post Oak Parkway, Suite 2360

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew William Caligur

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Richard Douglas Yeomans

Attorney at Graves Dougherty et al

401 Congress Ave, Ste 2200

Austin, TX 78701

Stephen Edmund O'Day

Attorney at Smith Gambrell & Russell LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3100 Promenade

Atlanta, GA 30309

Karen M Alvarado

Attorney at Brothers Alvarado PC

10333 Richmond, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77042

Robert Lee Horn

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

1900 West Loop South, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77027

Roger B Greenberg

Attorney at Sponsel Miller Greenberg PLLC

50 Briar Hollow Lane, Suite 370 West

Houston, TX 77027

Timothy Derek Carson

Attorney at Cantey Hanger LLP

600 W 6Th St, Ste 300

Fort Worth, TX 76102

267 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#4529

#4134

#4128

#4124

#4114

#4085

#4084

#4083

#4082

#4964

(#4964) ORDER Mediation Conference set for EAGLE CONSTRUCTION AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES ON 5/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) . (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4963

(#4963) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Anthony W Hernandez re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. An updated address could not be found. (DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#4962

(#4962) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Anthony W Hernandez re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. An updated address could not be found (DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#4961

(#4961) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#4960

(#4960) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#4959

(#4959) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. as to EAGLE CONSTRUCTION AND ENVIRONMENTS ONLY Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo, filed. (cfelchak, 4) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4958

(#4958) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4955 Order,, filed. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#4957

No Description Available

#4956

No Description Available

6,778 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2022. Negotiations continued. Appearances:Mathew Caligur.(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4964) ORDER Mediation Conference set for EAGLE CONSTRUCTION AND ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES ON 5/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified.(cfelchak, 4) . (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4963) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Anthony W Hernandez re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. An updated address could not be found. (DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4962) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Anthony W Hernandez re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. An updated address could not be found (DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4961) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4960) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4959 Notice of Resetting, filed. (DorinaReyna, 1) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2022. Parties did not settle Appearances:(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4959) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. as to EAGLE CONSTRUCTION AND ENVIRONMENTS ONLY Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 02:00 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo, filed. (cfelchak, 4) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 4/6/2022. Settlement not reached. Appearances:(ERO:No), filed.(cfelchak, 4) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4958) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Oil Patch Transportation, Inc. re: #4955 Order,, filed. (hlerma, 4) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
5,067 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Sun Coast Resources, Inc. by USOR Site PRP Group, filed. (Justis, Gary) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (hcarr, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Williams Brothers Construction Co., Inc. by USOR Site PRP Group, filed. (Justis, Gary) (Entered: 08/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/31/2014 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 11B before Judge Lee H Rosenthal (Signed by Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4) (Entered: 08/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Dismissal as to Pathfinder Energy, Inc. by USOR Site PRP Group, filed. (Justis, Gary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Dismissal as to The Meadows Group, LLC by USOR Site PRP Group, filed. (Justis, Gary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13610874) filed by USOR Site PRP Group.(Justis, Gary) (Entered: 08/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lone Star Heat Treating Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hoerbiger Service Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Exterran Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Texas A&M University is a litigant