This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:45:34 (UTC).

USA v. Webb et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2018 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Webb. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Candace J. Smith and David L. Bunning. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Yolanda A. Genao Reyes

Dustin Webb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis W. Thompson

Attorney at Clunk, Hoose Co., LPA

2360 Chauvin Drive, Suite 204

Lexington, KY 40517

Defendant Attorney

Dean A. Pisacano

Attorney at Hellings & Pisacano, P.S.C.

214 E. Fourth Street

Covington, KY 41011

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Affidavit AFF in Spt of MTN for WOA - Dustin Webb

6 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order for WOA - Dustin Webb

1 #1

Exhibit A-Promissory Note

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Yolanda A. Genao Reyes, Dustin Webb; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#6

(#6) FIRST MOTION for warning order attorney by USA Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFF in Spt of MTN for WOA - Dustin Webb, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for WOA - Dustin Webb)(Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Dustin Webb. (Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4122289), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Proof Statement of Account, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Dustin Webb, #7 Summons Yolanda Reyes)(ECO) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail Restricted to Yolanda A. Genao Reyes served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #6

Summons Dustin Webb

1 #7

Summons Yolanda Reyes

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Mortgage

#4

(#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/18/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit D-Affidavit of Proof Statement of Account

#8

(#8) ORDER: 1) Motion for the Appointment of a Warning Order Attorney for Defendant Dustin Webb #6 is hereby granted. 2) Pursuant to Rules 4(e)(1) and 4(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rules 4.05, 4.06, 4.07 and 4.08 of the Kentucky Rules of Civil Procedure, the following, a practicing attorney in good standing with this Court, is hereby appointed Warning Order Attorney for the Defendant Dustin Webb: Dean A. Pisacano, 214 E. Fourth Street, Covington, KY 41011. 3) WOA shall make diligent efforts to inform said Deft by mail, concerning the pendency and nature of the within action; 4) If WOA cannot inform the Def, he shall report to the Court and shall make a defense by answer if the WOA can. If unable to make a defense, WOA shall so report; 5) If WOA knows or learns that Def is an unmarried infant or of unsound mind or otherwise under a legal disability, such info shall be included in the WOA report; 6) The United States' cause of action if for the foreclosure of the Government's mortgage lien(s) on the subject property. Upon receipt of this Order, the Plf's atty shall cause to be delivered to the WOA's office the following: copy of complaint, copy of Plf's Motion for Order, and copy of this Order; 7) Upon the filing of the report, WOA may file a motion and affidavit for payment of WOA's fees and expenses. The Court will award the WOA the customary fee for such services as well as reasonable expenses. WOA's fee and expenses shall be taxed as costs; 8) Plf's payment policies for said WOA's fees and expenses require, on average, sixty (60) days for payment. In the event that the above appointed WOA has objection to said payment schedule, he should move the Court for an order withdrawing from this case within ten (10) days of entry hereof. Otherwise, he shall be deemed subject to Plf's payment schedule. (Parties to see Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/4/2018. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/04/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: 1) Motion for the Appointment of a Warning Order Attorney for Defendant Dustin Webb #6 is hereby granted. 2) Pursuant to Rules 4(e)(1) and 4(g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rules 4.05, 4.06, 4.07 and 4.08 of the Kentucky Rules of Civil Procedure, the following, a practicing attorney in good standing with this Court, is hereby appointed Warning Order Attorney for the Defendant Dustin Webb: Dean A. Pisacano, 214 E. Fourth Street, Covington, KY 41011. 3) WOA shall make diligent efforts to inform said Deft by mail, concerning the pendency and nature of the within action; 4) If WOA cannot inform the Def, he shall report to the Court and shall make a defense by answer if the WOA can. If unable to make a defense, WOA shall so report; 5) If WOA knows or learns that Def is an unmarried infant or of unsound mind or otherwise under a legal disability, such info shall be included in the WOA report; 6) The United States' cause of action if for the foreclosure of the Government's mortgage lien(s) on the subject property. Upon receipt of this Order, the Plf's atty shall cause to be delivered to the WOA's office the following: copy of complaint, copy of Plf's Motion for Order, and copy of this Order; 7) Upon the filing of the report, WOA may file a motion and affidavit for payment of WOA's fees and expenses. The Court will award the WOA the customary fee for such services as well as reasonable expenses. WOA's fee and expenses shall be taxed as costs; 8) Plf's payment policies for said WOA's fees and expenses require, on average, sixty (60) days for payment. In the event that the above appointed WOA has objection to said payment schedule, he should move the Court for an order withdrawing from this case within ten (10) days of entry hereof. Otherwise, he shall be deemed subject to Plf's payment schedule. (Parties to see Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/4/2018. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith for review: re #6 FIRST MOTION for warning order attorney by USA (LST) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail Restricted to Yolanda A. Genao Reyes served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST MOTION for warning order attorney by USA Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFF in Spt of MTN for WOA - Dustin Webb, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for WOA - Dustin Webb)(Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Dustin Webb. (Thompson, Travis) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Yolanda A. Genao Reyes, Dustin Webb; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4122289), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Proof Statement of Account, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Dustin Webb, #7 Summons Yolanda Reyes)(ECO) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.