This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2018 at 07:43:43 (UTC).

USA v. Patterson et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Patterson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Revenue Cabinet, KY Commonwealth of

Asset Acceptance, LLC

National Check Bureau, Inc.

Unknown Spouse of Glorida D. Patterson

Retina & Vitreous of Kentucky

Gloria D. Patterson

Blue World Pools, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren B. Durham

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

James S. Watson

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Summons Reissued as to Gloria D. Patterson. (SYD) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

13 #1

Summons Gloria D. Patterson

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF FILING by USA (Attachments: #1 Summons Gloria D. Patterson)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

12 #4

Exhibit USPS Tracking Info

12 #3

Exhibit Green Card

12 #2

Exhibit Envelope

12 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#12

(#12) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Gloria D. Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED by USA: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Blue World Pools, Inc. COMPLETED on 11/13/2018. Secretary of State return states-- enclosing return receipt confirming receipt of summons. (SYD) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

10 #3

Exhibit Green Card

10 #2

Exhibit Envelope

10 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to National Check Bureau, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (SYD). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

9 #3

Exhibit Green Card

9 #2

Exhibit Envelope

9 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Revenue Cabinet, KY Commonwealth of served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit Envelope

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Reissued as to Gloria D. Patterson. (SYD) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF FILING by USA (Attachments: #1 Summons Gloria D. Patterson)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USA as to Gloria D. Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS RETURNED by USA: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Blue World Pools, Inc. COMPLETED on 11/13/2018. Secretary of State return states-- enclosing return receipt confirming receipt of summons. (SYD) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to National Check Bureau, Inc. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) Modified text on 10/30/2018 (SYD). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Revenue Cabinet, KY Commonwealth of served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Retina & Vitreous of Kentucky served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) **INCORRECT** For correct entry see DE #10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) Modified on 10/30/2018 (SYD). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Asset Acceptance, LLC served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Secretary of State re #4 Summons Issued. (SYD) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Blue World Pools, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State (package prepared for service to Blue World). (SYD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Asset Acceptance, LLC, National Check Bureau, Inc., Gloria D. Patterson, Retina & Vitreous of Kentucky, Revenue Cabinet, KY Commonwealth of; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SYD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (SYD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by USA. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184910) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit USDA Mortgage, #4 Exhibit Subsidy Agreement, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Account, #6 Exhibit Blue World Pool Mortgage, #7 Exhibit Blue World Pool Financing Statement, #8 Exhibit Retina & Vitreous Lien, #9 Exhibit National Check Bureau Lien, #10 Exhibit Asset Acceptance Lien, #11 Exhibit Commonwealth of KY Lien, #12 Summons Patterson, #13 Summons Blue World, #14 Summons Retina, #15 Summons National Check, #16 Summons Asset, #17 Summons Commonwealth)(SYD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.