This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 08:10:07 (UTC).

USA v. Gross et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Gross. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00561

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Unknown Spouse of Carole A. Gross

Carole A. Gross

Jamie Lynn Blankenship

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren B. Durham

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

James S. Watson

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

 

Court Documents

5 #4

Exhibit USPS Tracking Info

5 #3

Exhibit Green Card

5 #2

Exhibit Envelope

5 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Carole A. Gross served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit Marital Status Letter

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marital Status Letter)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jamie Lynn Blankenship, Carole A. Gross; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (SCD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

1 #10

Summons to be issued for Jamie Lynn Blankenship

1 #9

Summons to be issued for Carole A. Gross

1 #8

Exhibit G - Affidavit of Vickie Jones

1 #7

Exhibit F - Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #6

Exhibit E - Second Mortgage

1 #5

Exhibit D - Second Promissory Note

1 #3

Exhibit B - First Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit A - First Promissory Note

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by USA. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184648) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - First Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Assumption Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Second Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit E - Second Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Vickie Jones, #9 Summons to be issued for Carole A. Gross, #10 Summons to be issued for Jamie Lynn Blankenship)(SCD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Carole A. Gross served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #4 Notice of Filing of Letter re Marital Status. (TDA) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING by USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Marital Status Letter)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (STC) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Jamie Lynn Blankenship, Carole A. Gross; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (SCD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by USA. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184648) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - First Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Assumption Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Second Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit E - Second Mortgage, #7 Exhibit F - Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #8 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Vickie Jones, #9 Summons to be issued for Carole A. Gross, #10 Summons to be issued for Jamie Lynn Blankenship)(SCD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.