This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2018 at 07:32:58 (UTC).

USA v. Grinstead et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Grinstead. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Miriah D. Grinstead

Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet

Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Molly E. Rose

Attorney at Morgan & Pottinger, P.S.C. - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

Charles J. Otten

Attorney at Morgan & Pottinger, P.S.C. - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Clay Johnson Lamb

Attorney at Kentucky Education and Workforce Development Cabinet

300 Sower Blvd, 4Th Floor

Frankfort, KY 40601

George Scott Hayworth

Attorney at Hughes, Lowry, Milner & Hayworth

271 W. Short Street, Suite 812

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified mail to Miriah D. Grinstead served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B Mortgage

1 #3

Exhibit C Subsidy Repayment Agreement

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet, Miriah D. Grinstead; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: (1) GRANTING USA's #4 MOTION for warning order attorney for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; (2) Attorney George Scott Hayworth is appointed for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; (3) WOA shall make diligent effort to inform dft concerning pendency of this action & report the results w/in 60 days; (4) if WOA cannot inform dft of this action, he shall so report & then make a defense; if unable to make a defense, WOA shall so report; (5) pla's mot sets forth the property's address & dft's address last known to pla; (6) at time of filing report, WOA may also file a motion & afdt for payment of fee & expenses; (7) USA & WOA are referred to the Notice filed this date re the timing of payment of services provided by WOA. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/30/18.(KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4119678), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Affidavit of Proof of Statment of Account, #6 Summons Tendered, M. Grinstead, #7 Summons Tendered, Commonwealth, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified mail to Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE: re #7 Order; USA moved to appoint a Warning Order Attorney for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; following appointment & completion of services WOA is requested to notify the court if payment is not made for services rendered w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/30/18.(KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 07/30/2018)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Affidavit of Counsel

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons Tendered, M. Grinstead

1 #5

Exhibit E Affidavit of Proof of Statment of Account

#4

(#4) MOTION for warning order attorney by USA for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#9

(#9) FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet.(Lamb, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A Promissory Note

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST ANSWER to Complaint by Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet.(Lamb, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE: re #7 Order; USA moved to appoint a Warning Order Attorney for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; following appointment & completion of services WOA is requested to notify the court if payment is not made for services rendered w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/30/18.(KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: (1) GRANTING USA's #4 MOTION for warning order attorney for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; (2) Attorney George Scott Hayworth is appointed for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead; (3) WOA shall make diligent effort to inform dft concerning pendency of this action & report the results w/in 60 days; (4) if WOA cannot inform dft of this action, he shall so report & then make a defense; if unable to make a defense, WOA shall so report; (5) pla's mot sets forth the property's address & dft's address last known to pla; (6) at time of filing report, WOA may also file a motion & afdt for payment of fee & expenses; (7) USA & WOA are referred to the Notice filed this date re the timing of payment of services provided by WOA. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/30/18.(KJR)cc: COR (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified mail to Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified mail to Miriah D. Grinstead served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for warning order attorney by USA for Unknown Spouse of Miriah D. Grinstead (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Otten, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (STC) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Kentucky Workforce Development Cabinet, Miriah D. Grinstead; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service. (STC) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4119678), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Exhibit D Reamortization Agreement, #5 Exhibit E Affidavit of Proof of Statment of Account, #6 Summons Tendered, M. Grinstead, #7 Summons Tendered, Commonwealth, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(STC) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.