This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 08:10:03 (UTC).

USA v. Day et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Day. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00053

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

Michelle Day

Lawrenceburg, KY 40342

Thomas M. Day

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren B. Durham

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

James S. Watson

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP - Owensboro

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michelle Day, Thomas M. Day cc: COR, dfts (CBD) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

6 #3

Proposed Order Entry of Default

6 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Account

6 #1

Affidavit Default Affidavit

#6

(#6) MOTION for Entry of Default by USA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Default Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Account, #3 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

5 #4

Exhibit USPS Tracking Info

5 #3

Exhibit Green Card

5 #2

Exhibit Envelope

5 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Michelle Day served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

4 #4

Exhibit USPS Tracking Info

4 #3

Exhibit Green Card

4 #2

Exhibit Envelope

4 #1

Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Thomas M. Day served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

3 #1

Summons Michelle Day

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Michelle Day, Thomas M. Day; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Michelle Day)(CBD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184396), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Promissory Note, #3 Mortgage, #4 Subsidy Agreement, #5 Affidavit of Account, #6 Summons Thomas Day, #7 Summons Michelle Day)(CBD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michelle Day, Thomas M. Day cc: COR, dfts (CBD) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Entry of Default by USA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Default Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Account, #3 Proposed Order Entry of Default)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Michelle Day served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USA via Certified Mail to Thomas M. Day served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Mail Receipt, #2 Exhibit Envelope, #3 Exhibit Green Card, #4 Exhibit USPS Tracking Info)(Durham, Lauren) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Michelle Day, Thomas M. Day; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Michelle Day)(CBD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4184396), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Promissory Note, #3 Mortgage, #4 Subsidy Agreement, #5 Affidavit of Account, #6 Summons Thomas Day, #7 Summons Michelle Day)(CBD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.