This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:30:17 (UTC).

USA v. BMW 535I 2011

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against BMW 535I 2011. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00692

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendant

BMW 535I 2011

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert J. Rabuck

Attorney at US Attorney's Office (NH)

James C Cleveland Federal Bldg, 53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Advertisement Copy

2 #1

Advertisement Certification Report

#2

(#2) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 9/12/2018. Claim due on 10/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Advertisement Copy)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #2

Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date 9/12/2018. Claim due on 10/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Advertisement Copy)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem issued as to BMW 535I 2011. (lml) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (lml) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-692-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/FORFEITURE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Warrant of Arrest in rem)(Rabuck, Robert) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less