This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2018 at 07:42:58 (UTC).

USA v. $20,978.00 in United States currency

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 USA filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against 20,978 00 in United States currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02065

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Claimant

Frederick Williams

Defendant

$20,978.00 in United States currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tonya Shotwell Andrews

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Claimant Attorney

Frank E. Moya

Attorney at Frank Moya, Law Office of

1775 Sherman Street, Suite 1650

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 10/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/21/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A Proposed Scheduling Order is due 11/14/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#12

(#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties consent.. (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

11 #1

Publication

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Frederick Williams.(Moya, Frank) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank E. Moya on behalf of Frederick williamsAttorney Frank E. Moya added to party Frederick williams(pty:clm) (Moya, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#7

(#7) CLAIM by Claimant Frederick williams. (Moya, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#5

(#5) WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem issued as to $20,978.00 in United States Currency. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/14/18. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Warrant for Arrest of Property

1 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $20,978.00 in United States currency Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 10/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/21/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A Proposed Scheduling Order is due 11/14/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#13) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Pursuant to the parties' consent (Dkt. #12) and 28 USC 636(c) this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Wang to fully preside over for all purposes. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/26/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties consent.. (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Frederick Williams.(Moya, Frank) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER setting Status Conference for 10/2/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Furthermore, the Consent Form is due by 9/25/2018. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/24/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Frank E. Moya on behalf of Frederick williamsAttorney Frank E. Moya added to party Frederick williams(pty:clm) (Moya, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLAIM by Claimant Frederick williams. (Moya, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem issued as to $20,978.00 in United States Currency. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property IN REM, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/14/18. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $20,978.00 in United States currency Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.