This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2018 at 07:41:26 (UTC).

USA v. $12,199.93 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 5005629403 et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 USA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 12,199 93 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 5005629403. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01982

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USA

Defendants

$30,000.00 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 9510413466

$12,199.93 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 5005629403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tonya Shotwell Andrews

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Publication

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#6

(#6) WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem, issued by Clerk. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/27/18. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Warrant for Arrest of Property

1 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $12,199.93 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 5005629403, $30,000.00 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 9510413466 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Publication)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WARRANT For Arrest of Property In Rem, issued by Clerk. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/27/18. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $12,199.93 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 5005629403, $30,000.00 seized from JP Morgan Chase Bank Representing the Funds from Cashier's Check Number 9510413466 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.