This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2017 at 16:02:54 (UTC).

Usa, Et Al V. One Palmetto State Armory Pa 1, Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2015 a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture case was filed by Usa against One Palmetto State Armory Pa 1 in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-2859

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ryan S. Watson, Individually And As Trustee Of The Watson Family Gun Trust

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States Of America

Defendant / Appellees

One Palmetto State Armory Pa 15 Machinegun Receiver Frame Unknown Caliber Serial Number Lw001804

Watson Family Gun Trust, Claimant

Attorney General United States Of America

Director Bureau Of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives

Amicus Curiae

The Heller Foundation

Institute On The Constitution

Gun Owners Of California Inc

Conservative Legal Defense And Education Fund

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Mandate Letter

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

Mandate Issued

Open Document

ORDER (MCKEE, Chief Judge, AMBRO, FUENTES, SMITH, FISHER, CHAGARES, JORDAN, HARDIMAN, GREENAWAY JR., VANASKIE, SHWARTZ, KRAUSE, RESTREPO and *THOMPSON, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel and En Banc Rehearing filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Ambro, Authoring Judge. *Honorable Anne E. Thompson, District Judge for the United States Court for the District of New Jersey, sitting by designation voted as to panel rehearing only. (TYW)

Open Document #3

Judgment

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

Petition for Rehearing by Court En Banc

Open Document #2

Notice of Judgment

Open Document #1

Judgment Entered

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust advising this court that no transcripts are available. (SDS)

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen D. Stamboulieh on behalf of Appellant(s) Ryan S. Watson, Individually and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust. (SDS)

Open Document

CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (OM)

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #3

District Court Memorandum072215

Open Document #2

District Court Order072215

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (TYW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (MCKEE, Chief Judge, AMBRO, FUENTES, SMITH, FISHER, CHAGARES, JORDAN, HARDIMAN, GREENAWAY JR., VANASKIE, SHWARTZ, KRAUSE, RESTREPO and *THOMPSON, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel and En Banc Rehearing filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson, filed. Ambro, Authoring Judge. *Honorable Anne E. Thompson, District Judge for the United States Court for the District of New Jersey, sitting by designation voted as to panel rehearing only. (TYW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson for Rehearing before original panel and the court en banc. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2016. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant. (TYW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: AMBRO, KRAUSE and *THOMPSON, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 17. Judge: THOMPSON Authoring. *Honorable Anne E. Thompson, District Judge for the United States Court for the District of New Jersey, sitting by designation. (TYW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Letter dated 04/09/2016 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [15-2859, 14-3812, 14-2966, 14-4127, 15-3061, 15-3117] (PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • ARGUED on Monday, April 04, 2016. Panel: AMBRO, KRAUSE, Circuit Judges and THOMPSON, District Judge. Patrick Nemeroff arguing for Appellee Attorney General United States of America; Stephen D. Stamboulieh arguing for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. (PM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Attorney General United States of America, Director Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives and USA to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/28/2016. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (PN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Letter dated 03/22/2016 , filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellant Ryan S. Watson. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 08/15/2015. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America; Attorney General of the United States of America; Director of the Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives. (PN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick G. Nemeroff on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America; Attorney General of the United States of America; Director of the Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Firearms & Explosives. (PN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust, received. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust, filed. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson and Appellee Watson Family Gun Trust advising this court that no transcripts are available. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stephen D. Stamboulieh on behalf of Appellant(s) Ryan S. Watson, Individually and as Trustee of the Watson Family Gun Trust. (SDS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect., filed. (OM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (OM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ryan S. Watson in District Court No. 2-15-cv-02202,2-14-cv-06569. (OM)

    Read MoreRead Less