This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2018 at 07:54:49 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA v. THOITS et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THOITS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III, D. BROCK HORNBY and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00417

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judges

D. BROCK HORNBY

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

BETHANY A THOITS

RYAN W THOITS

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

CACH LLC

DISCOVER BANK

Interested Parties and Not Classified By Court

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

MAINE REVENUE SERVICES

CACH LLC

DISCOVER BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

Interested Party Attorney

KEVIN J. CROSMAN

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Six State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest Capital One Bank (USA), NA by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/6/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Bethany A. Thoits and Ryan W. Thoits; and Parties-in-Interest, Arrow Financial Services, LLC, CACH, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, and Discover Bank with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/3/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

3 #7

Capital One Bank (USA) NA summons

3 #6

Maine Revenue Services summons

3 #5

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC summons

3 #4

Discover Bank summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, CACH LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, DISCOVER BANK, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Bethany A. Thoits summons, #2 Arrow Financial Services, LLC summons, #3 Cach LLC summons, #4 Discover Bank summons, #5 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC summons, #6 Maine Revenue Services summons, #7 Capital One Bank (USA) NA summons)(bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #8

Exhibit H Demand Letters

1 #7

Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment

1 #6

Exhibit F Assignment into U.S. Bank Trust

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E Assignment into Secretary of Housing & Urban Development

1 #4

Exhibit D Assignment into Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP

1 #3

Exhibit C Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B Affidavit of Lost Note

1 #1

Exhibit A Legal Description

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declartion in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • Set Deadlines Regarding Order : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/14/2018. (jwr) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • (#21) ORDER re 20 Conference of Counsel. On November 29, 2018, I held a teleconference with Attorneys Longoria and Crosman, for the plaintiff and party-in-interest Maine Revenue Service, respectively, to inquire about pretrial discovery in this matter, where all defendants have been defaulted. Counsel stated that their clients did not intend to engage in discovery, and Attorney Longoria stated that she intended to file motions for default judgment imminently. Accordingly, without objection, I ORDERED the plaintiff to file its motions for default judgment by December 14, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Conference of Counsel held re: pretrial schedule; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#19) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:00 PM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#18) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/17/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest Capital One Bank (USA), NA by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/6/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 12/14/2018 as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA. (jgd) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, CACH LLC, DISCOVER BANK, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS. Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 12/13/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: J. Driscoll. (jgd) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Bethany A. Thoits and Ryan W. Thoits; and Parties-in-Interest, Arrow Financial Services, LLC, CACH, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, and Discover Bank with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 12/3/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. BETHANY A THOITS served on 10/17/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. RYAN W THOITS served on 10/17/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declartion in Support of Priority Position)(CROSMAN, KEVIN) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT With Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1911358.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, CACH LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA, DISCOVER BANK, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC, BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Bethany A. Thoits summons, #2 Arrow Financial Services, LLC summons, #3 Cach LLC summons, #4 Discover Bank summons, #5 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC summons, #6 Maine Revenue Services summons, #7 Capital One Bank (USA) NA summons)(bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BETHANY A THOITS, RYAN W THOITS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/7/2019) Fee due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Lost Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Assignment into Secretary of Housing & Urban Development, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into U.S. Bank Trust, #7 Exhibit G Quitclaim Assignment, #8 Exhibit H Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less