This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2018 at 07:50:50 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NA v. FAVREAU et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2018 US BANK TRUST NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FAVREAU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00368

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NA

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

DAVID FAVREAU

DEBRA FAVREAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

 

Court Documents

#13

#11

#9

#8

#7

#5

#4

3 #1

Debra Favreau summons

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E military affidavit

1 #4

Exhibit D payment history

1 #3

Exhibit C demand letter

1 #2

Exhibit B note

1 #1

Exhibit A legal description

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by US BANK TRUST NA (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service : This docket entry was modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect the document will be refiled as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (mjlt) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ** DOCKET ENTRY MADE IN ERROR AND WILL BE REFILED BY COUNSEL** MOTION to Dismiss with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 11/23/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) Modified on 11/5/2018 to reflect docket entry will be refilled as a Notice of Dismissal (mjlt). (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to DAVID FAVREAU, DEBRA FAVREAU Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 11/16/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Stacey Graf. (slg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 11/6/2018. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 11/15/2018. (jib) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketSET Answer Deadline for DAVID FAVREAU AND DEBRA FAVREAU: Answer due by 10/12/2018. (slg) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. DEBRA FAVREAU served on 9/21/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. DAVID FAVREAU served on 9/21/2018. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification : case reassigned to Judge D. Brock Hornby. (bfa) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by US BANK TRUST NA. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1899663.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/20/2018. (bfa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to DAVID FAVREAU, DEBRA FAVREAU. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Debra Favreau summons)(bfa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DAVID FAVREAU, DEBRA FAVREAU PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA. (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A legal description, #2 Exhibit B note, #3 Exhibit C demand letter, #4 Exhibit D payment history, #5 Exhibit E military affidavit)(bfa) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN A. DOONAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RENEAU J. LONGORIA