This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2018 at 07:54:19 (UTC).

Urrabazo v. Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 Urrabazo filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home Depot U S A Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard B. Farrer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00917

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard B. Farrer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adrianna Urrabazo

Defendant

Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Packard

Attorney at The Packard Law Firm

1100 Nw Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213-2258

Daniel W. Packard

Attorney at Packard Law Firm

1100 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine P. Harrison

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

C. Brett Stecklein

2515 Mckinney Ave., Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Chad Lane Farrar

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown LLP

2515 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER RESETTING, ( Status Conference & any Pending Motion Hearing Re-set for 12/3/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard B. Farrer for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 11/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/30/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2018, Discovery due by 4/30/2019, Motions due by 5/24/2019,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#7

(#7) Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order AGREED by Adrianna Urrabazo. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26 Report by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Adrianna Urrabazo. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due October 9, 2018); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit B Disclosure Stmt.

1 #7

Exhibit A-6 Notice of Filing

1 #5

Exhibit A-4 Case Info Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit A-3 Citation

1 #3

Exhibit A-2 Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11191665), filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index, #2 Exhibit A-1 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 Petition, #4 Exhibit A-3 Citation, #5 Exhibit A-4 Case Info Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-5 Answer, #7 Exhibit A-6 Notice of Filing, #8 Exhibit B Disclosure Stmt., #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RESETTING, ( Status Conference & any Pending Motion Hearing Re-set for 12/3/2018 10:30 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer,). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (wg) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard B. Farrer for all proceedings. Judge Xavier Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS FOR 11/29/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 09:30 AM before Judge Xavier Rodriguez, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/30/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2018, Discovery due by 4/30/2019, Motions due by 5/24/2019,. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (jhw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order AGREED by Adrianna Urrabazo. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26 Report by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Adrianna Urrabazo. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER AND ADVISORY for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plantiff shall submit agreed scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court.(Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Schedule Order due October 9, 2018); Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez.(jhw) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (bc) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-11191665), filed by Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Index, #2 Exhibit A-1 Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-2 Petition, #4 Exhibit A-3 Citation, #5 Exhibit A-4 Case Info Sheet, #6 Exhibit A-5 Answer, #7 Exhibit A-6 Notice of Filing, #8 Exhibit B Disclosure Stmt., #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harrison, Katherine) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. Brett Stecklein