This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:43:44 (UTC).

Urda et al v. Valmont Industries Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Urda filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Valmont Industries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01044

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rachel Urda

Harris Urda

Harris Eugene Urda

Defendants

New South Access & Environmental Solutions, LLC

American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.

Valmont Industries Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Taylor Townsend

Attorney at T. Taylor Townsend, LLC

P.O. Box 784

Natchitoches, LA 71458-0784

Brandon Trey Morris

Attorney at Simmons, Morris & Carroll, L.L.C.

509 Milam Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

Defendant Attorneys

Sidney W. Degan, III

Attorney at Degan, Blanchard & Nash - NO

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Keith Alex Kornman

Attorney at Degan, Blanchard & Nash

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2600

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1866586.), filed by Harris Urda, Rachel Urda. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten the attachment (KAH). Modified on 12/3/2018 to replace document per RD 10 (SWE). Modified on 12/13/2018 to replace document as per rec doc 13 (KAH). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#3

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Strike 2 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet , #4 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

3 #1

Order

4 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#4

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Strike 2 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet , #4 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

4 #1

Order

#5

(#5) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

8 #2

summons

8 #1

summons

#24

(#24) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kornman, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

24 #1

Attachment

#21

(#21) MOTION to Strike 17 Summons Returned Executed, 18 Summons Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Townsend, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

21 #1

Order

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Eugene Urda, Rachel Urda. . New South Access & Environmental Solutions, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Eugene Urda, Rachel Urda. American Piledriving Equipment, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. American Piledriving Equipment, Inc. responsive pleadings due due 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Piledriving Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kornman, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • (#23) Notice to Counsel: In light of all defendants having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 is CANCELED. Scheduling Conference is reset for 2/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Strike R. Docs. 17 and 18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION to Strike 17 Summons Returned Executed, 18 Summons Returned Executed . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Strike 17 Summons Returned Executed, 18 Summons Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Townsend, Thomas) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Eugene Urda, Rachel Urda. . New South Access & Environmental Solutions, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Eugene Urda, Rachel Urda. American Piledriving Equipment, Inc. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit the text (SWE). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • (#18) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD SUMMONS Returned Executed by Harris Eugene Urda, Rachel Urda. New South Access & Environmental Solutions, LLC served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 1/14/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 22. (EDC). (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to American Piledriving Equipment, Inc., New South Access & Environmental Solutions, LLC, Valmont Industries Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Strike 2 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet , #4 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Submitted (Townsend, Thomas) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/28/2018) (EDC). Modified on 11/28/2018 to flatten document. (EDC). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, Thomas) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Strike 2 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Townsend, Thomas) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: 2 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#2) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order)(Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2018 to remove document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 9 (SWE). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BLAMDC-1866586.), filed by Harris Urda, Rachel Urda. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Townsend, Thomas) Modified on 11/27/2018 to flatten the attachment (KAH). Modified on 12/3/2018 to replace document per RD 10 (SWE). Modified on 12/13/2018 to replace document as per rec doc 13 (KAH). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.