This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 22:39:35 (UTC).

Urban Textile, Inc. v. Stage Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2015 Urban Textile, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Stage Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-03456

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Urban Textile, Inc.

Defendants

Mark Edwards Apparel, Inc.

Stage Stores, Inc.

Does

Specialty Retailers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel David Hoffman

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 2280

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Chan Yong Jeong

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 2280

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul Jarvis Cohen

1055 West 7Th Street Suite 2280

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) ORDER TO SUBMIT THE REGISTER OF COPYRIGHTS DETERMINATION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff to submit a copy of the Register of Copyrights determination by November 3, 2016. The Courts previous stay shall remain in effect until Plaintiff submits the determination. Upon receipt of the determination, the Court shall lift the stay and issue an order setting relevant dates and deadlines. (lc)

#28

(#28) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re: Stipulation for Protective Order, 27 . (mz)

#36

(#36) ORDER RESCHEDULING DATES by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, the Court lifts its previous order to stay and sets the following dates and deadlines: Trial 9:00 AM., 6/6/2017. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 6/1/2017. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 PM., on 5/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference at 01:30 PM; Motions in Limine to be Filed; Proposed Voir Dire Questions and Agreed-to Statement of Case on 5/15/2017. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order and Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation; File Trial briefs; File Contentions of Fact and Law; Exhibit and Witness Lists; File Status Report Regarding Settlement; File Agreed Upon Set of Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc. on 5/1/2017; Last Day for Hearing Motions on 4/10/2017; Last Date to Conduct Settlement Conference 4/3/2017; Discovery Cut-Off for All Discovery 3/6/2017. (jp)

#81

(#81) JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Urban Textile, Inc., shall recover nothing from Defendants, and its claims against Defendants are dismissed on the merits and with prejudice. Defendants shall recover their costs from Urban Textile, Inc. as evidenced by a Bill of Costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff Urban Textile, Inc., shall recover nothing from Defendants, and its claims against Defendants are dismissed on the merits and with prejudice. Defendants shall recover their costs from Urban Textile, Inc. as evidenced by a Bill of Costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER RESCHEDULING DATES by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, the Court lifts its previous order to stay and sets the following dates and deadlines: Trial 9:00 AM., 6/6/2017. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 6/1/2017. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 PM., on 5/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference at 01:30 PM; Motions in Limine to be Filed; Proposed Voir Dire Questions and Agreed-to Statement of Case on 5/15/2017. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order and Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation; File Trial briefs; File Contentions of Fact and Law; Exhibit and Witness Lists; File Status Report Regarding Settlement; File Agreed Upon Set of Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc. on 5/1/2017; Last Day for Hearing Motions on 4/10/2017; Last Date to Conduct Settlement Conference 4/3/2017; Discovery Cut-Off for All Discovery 3/6/2017. (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER TO SUBMIT THE REGISTER OF COPYRIGHTS DETERMINATION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff to submit a copy of the Register of Copyrights determination by November 3, 2016. The Courts previous stay shall remain in effect until Plaintiff submits the determination. Upon receipt of the determination, the Court shall lift the stay and issue an order setting relevant dates and deadlines. (lc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, re: Stipulation for Protective Order, 27 . (mz)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.