This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 07:25:33 (UTC).

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al v. Lytle et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 UNUM Life Insurance Company of America filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lytle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-13234

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company

UNUM Life Insurance Company of America

Defendants

Brian Lytle

Ebon Evans

Detroit, MI 48012

Madison Lytle

Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc.

Charlotte M Montgomery

Jonathan Lytle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Neil J. Marchand

Attorney at Miller Johnson

250 Monroe Avenue, Nw, Suite 800, P.O. Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

D. Andrew Portinga

Attorney at Miller, Johnson,

45 Ottawa Ave. Sw, Ste. 1100

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony J. Sukkar

Attorney at State of Michigan Department of Attorney General

Po Box 30758

Lansing, MI 48909

Frederick R. Juckniess

Attorney at Juckniess Law Firm, PLC

302 E. Liberty, Suite 203

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER GRANTING #21 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company. (First Amended Complaint due by 12/28/2018) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

21 #1

Exhibit 1

#21

(#21) STIPULATION to File First Amended Complaint by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#20

(#20) ORDER Disclaiming Benefits and Dismissing Defendant Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc.. Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #17 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Response due by 12/14/2018) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Sukkar on behalf of Jonathan Lytle, Madison Lytle. (Sukkar, Anthony) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#16

(#16) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Brian Lytle* (DPer) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#15

(#15) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brian Lytle by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America against Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc., Ebon Evans, Brian Lytle, Jonathan Lytle, Madison Lytle, Charlotte M Montgomery. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6948753 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: out of state - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER GRANTING #21 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company. (First Amended Complaint due by 12/28/2018) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATION to File First Amended Complaint by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Disclaiming Benefits and Dismissing Defendant Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc.. Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING #17 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Response due by 12/14/2018) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Sukkar on behalf of Jonathan Lytle, Madison Lytle. (Sukkar, Anthony) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Brian Lytle* (DPer) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brian Lytle by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION Disclaiming Benefits And Dismissing Defendant Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc. by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Ebon Evans. (SSch) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Brian Lytle served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ebon Evans served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick R. Juckniess on behalf of Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc.. (Juckniess, Frederick) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Group UNUM for Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Group UNUM for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by D. Andrew Portinga on behalf of Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Portinga, D.) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America against Detroit Memorial Park Association, Inc., Ebon Evans, Brian Lytle, Jonathan Lytle, Madison Lytle, Charlotte M Montgomery. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6948753 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: out of state - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Marchand, Neil) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.