This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2018 at 07:54:07 (UTC).

Unlimited Ventures Utah et al v. Moreno et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Unlimited Ventures Utah filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Moreno. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00737

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Scarlett Menjivar

Josue Ramirez

Unlimited Ventures Utah

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Counter Claimants

Luis Alejandro Moreno

Erika Miranda

3Rd Party Defendants

Utah Key Real Estate

Samuel Rangel

Sergio Romecin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Ryan McCosh

Attorney at HEIDEMAN & ASSOCIATES

2696 N University Ave Ste 180

Provo, UT 84604

Justin D. Heideman

Attorney at HEIDEMAN & ASSOCIATES

2696 N University Ave Ste 180

Provo, UT 84604

Daniel J. McDonald

Attorney at MCDONALD FIELDING PLLC

175 W Canyon Crest Rd Ste 204

Alpine, UT 84004

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Peter H. Harrison

Attorney at MILLER HARRISON LLC

50 W Broadway Ste 450

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Douglas C. Shumway

Attorney at MILLER HARRISON LLC

50 W Broadway #450

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to Third District Court, West Jordan, via Mail. Remand Letter, Order, and Docket Sheet sent. (las) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Third Judicial District Court in and for Salt Lake County, State of Utah, Unlimited Ventures Utah, LLC et al. v. Moreno et al., Civil No. 180402784 EV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/19/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#12

(#12) Stipulated MOTION to Remand to 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, State of Utah filed by ThirdParty Defendant Utah Key Real Estate. (McDonald, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/18/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Third party complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno. NOTE- Originally filed is State Court on 9/17/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

9 #39

Motion

9 #34

Exhibits

9 #27

Notice of appearance

9 #22

Return of Service

9 #21

Return of Service

9 #20

Affidavit

9 #19

Notice to serve subpoena

9 #18

Motion

9 #17

Affidavit

9 #16

Motion

9 #15

Exhibit N-P

9 #14

Exhibit K-M

9 #13

Exhibit C - J

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL that case has been remanded to Third District Court, West Jordan, via Mail. Remand Letter, Order, and Docket Sheet sent. (las) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Third Judicial District Court in and for Salt Lake County, State of Utah, Unlimited Ventures Utah, LLC et al. v. Moreno et al., Civil No. 180402784 EV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/19/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Stipulated MOTION to Remand to 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, State of Utah filed by ThirdParty Defendant Utah Key Real Estate. (McDonald, Daniel) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/18/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Third party complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno. NOTE- Originally filed is State Court on 9/17/2018. (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) File Received from Third District Court, West Jordan, Salt Lake County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Answer to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibits, #8 Exhibits, #9 Lis Pendens, #10 Request for Hearing, #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C - J, #14 Exhibit K-M, #15 Exhibit N-P, #16 Motion, #17 Affidavit, #18 Motion, #19 Notice to serve subpoena, #20 Affidavit, #21 Return of Service, #22 Return of Service, #23 Return of Service, #24 Return of Service, #25 Notice, #26 Return of Service, #27 Notice of appearance, #28 Answer, #29 Opposition, #30 Exhibits, #31 Exhibits, #32 Exhibits, #33 Exhibits, #34 Exhibits, #35 Exhibits, #36 Exhibits, #37 Exhibits, #38 Exhibits, #39 Motion, #40 Proposed Order, #41 Reply, #42 Request, #43 Request, #44 Opposition, #45 Response, #46 Order, #47 Order, #48 Notice of Appearance, #49 Motion to Dismiss, #50 Notice of Appearance, #51 Motion to Dismiss, #52 Joinder, #53 Motion, #54 Sur Memorandum, #55 Motion) (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) File Received from Third District Court, West Jordan, Salt Lake County consisting of Documents filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Request to Submit, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit 5-8, #4 Exhibit 9-11, #5 Exhibit 12-14, #6 Exhibit 15-22, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Motion, #10 Defendant Statement, #11 Exhibit, #12 Rule 37, #13 Objection, #14 Request, #15 Motion, #16 Request, #17 Exhibit 1, #18 Exhibit 2, #19 Exhibit 3, #20 Exhibit 4, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 6, #23 Motion, #24 Notice of Joinder, #25 Request, #26 Supplement Sur reply, #27 Memorandum, #28 Order, #29 Order, #30 Reply Memorandum, #31 Request, #32 Memorandum, #33 Request, #34 Consent to law student, #35 Consent to law student, #36 law student certification, #37 Order, #38 Exhibit A, #39 Objection, #40 proposed order, #41 certificate of service, #42 proposed order, #43 statement of discovery, #44 Amended Complaint and Third Party Complaint, #45 Order, #46 Order, #47 Notice of Dismissal of Third Party Complaint) (las) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah, Defendants Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno, Third Party Defendants Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin. Form due by 10/3/2018. (rks) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah, Defendants Erika Miranda, Luis Alejandro Moreno, Third Party Defendants Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin. (rks) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin, Utah Key Real Estate filed by Luis Alejandro Moreno, Erika Miranda. (Filed in State Court) (rks) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Utah Key Real Estate, Samuel Rangel, Sergio Romecin, COUNTERCLAIM against Scarlett Menjivar, Josue Ramirez, Unlimited Ventures Utah filed by Luis Alejandro Moreno, Erika Miranda. (Filed in State Court) (rks) Modified by clarifying this was from state court on 9/18/2018 (rks). (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Dismissal of Federal Question Claim in State Court Matter by Luis Alejandro Moreno re #2 Notice of Removal,,,, #1 Remark - New Case, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Dismissal in State Action, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket showing dismissal) (Shumway, Douglas) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180402784, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3104230) filed by Utah Key Real Estate. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (Complaint), #3 Exhibit 2 (Answer and Counterclaim), #4 Exhibit 3 (Order on Utah Key Real Estate, LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings), #5 Exhibit 4 (Order Re: September 10, 2018 Telephonic Hearing), #6 Exhibit 5 (First Amended Third Party Complaint), #7 Exhibit 6 (Case Docket), #8 Exhibit 7 (Return of Service on UKRE), #9 Exhibit 8 (Order Following July 3, 2018 Hearing), #10 Exhibit 9 (Order - Overlength Memorandum), #11 Exhibit 10 (Order on Motion for Extension of Time), #12 Exhibit 11 (Order - Overlength Memorandum), #13 Exhibit 12 (Order Granting Sipulated Motion to Continue August 22, 2018 Hearing), #14 Exhibit 13 (Order on Defendants' Statement of Discovery Issues), #15 Exhibit 14 (Order on Statement of Discovery Issues Seeking Protection from Disclosure)) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (McDonald, Daniel) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. ThirdParty Defendant Utah Key Real Estate is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. McDonald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Ryan McCosh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin D. Heideman