This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/16/2017 at 04:16:11 (UTC).

Univest Capital Inc v. Orendorff MHT LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 Univest Capital Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Orendorff MHT LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara M.G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-02485

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara M.G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Univest Capital Inc

Defendants

Christopher Orendorff

Ascentium Capital LLC

Orendorff MHT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William J. Clements

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William R. Hinchman

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

Stephen S. Stallings

Attorney at The Law Offices of Stephen S Stallings Esq

The Osterling Building, 228 Isabella Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#14

(#14) Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01205. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 09/15/2017)

#13

(#13) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE; INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFENDANTS' MTOION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE; AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE ARE GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS IN DALLAS AND MARK THIS DOCKET CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/6/17. 9/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/6/17. 9/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

#11

(#11) PRAECIPE for Entry of Default against Orendorff MHT LLC filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 5/22/2017 (nd, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STALLINGS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/12/2017)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFT ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC'S & ALL INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFTS' UNOPPOSED REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE EXTENSIONS ARE GRANTED AND SAID DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 5/12/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/8/17. 5/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/10/2017)

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFT ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC'S & ALL INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFTS' UNOPPOSED REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE EXTENSIONS ARE GRANTED AND SAID DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 5/5/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/21/17. 4/24/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/24/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN S. STALLINGS on behalf of CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF (STALLINGS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Summons and Complaint upon Ascentium Capital, LLC by Federal Express, Return Receipt and Signature Required on March 29, 2017, answerd due 4/19/2017. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/11/2017 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/07/2017)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Summons and Complaint upon Orendorff MHT LLC by Federal Express, Return Receipt and Signature Required on March 28, 2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/6/2017 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS on behalf of UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/27/2017)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent UNIVEST BANK AND TRUST CO. for UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/20/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF, ORENDORFF MHT LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 156577.), filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/20/2017)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case electronically transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01205. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE; INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFENDANTS' MTOION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE; AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER VENUE ARE GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FORTHWITH TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS IN DALLAS AND MARK THIS DOCKET CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/6/17. 9/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/6/17. 9/13/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 09/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PRAECIPE for Entry of Default against Orendorff MHT LLC filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 5/22/2017 (nd, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STALLINGS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFT ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC'S & ALL INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFTS' UNOPPOSED REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE EXTENSIONS ARE GRANTED AND SAID DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 5/12/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/8/17. 5/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 05/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFT ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC'S & ALL INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIAN DEFTS' UNOPPOSED REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE EXTENSIONS ARE GRANTED AND SAID DEFTS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 5/5/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/21/17. 4/24/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTIES.(kw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN S. STALLINGS on behalf of CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF (STALLINGS, STEPHEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Summons and Complaint upon Ascentium Capital, LLC by Federal Express, Return Receipt and Signature Required on March 29, 2017, answerd due 4/19/2017. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/11/2017 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Summons and Complaint upon Christopher Orendorff by Federal Express, Return Receipt and Signature Required on March 30, 2017, answer due 4/20/2017. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/6/2017 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Federal Express re: served Summons and Complaint upon Orendorff MHT LLC by Federal Express, Return Receipt and Signature Required on March 28, 2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/6/2017 (tjd). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS on behalf of UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC. (CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Summons Issued as to ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF, ORENDORFF MHT LLC. Three Forwarded To: Counsel on 3/20/17 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent UNIVEST BANK AND TRUST CO. for UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC.. by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASCENTIUM CAPITAL, LLC, CHRISTOPHER ORENDORFF, ORENDORFF MHT LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 156577.), filed by UNIVEST CAPITAL, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/15/2017.] (Entered: 03/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Univest Capital, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCENTIUM CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS