This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2018 at 07:02:21 (UTC).

Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 Unity Opto Technology Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd.

Defendants

L G Sourcing, Incorporated

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yitai Hu

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Jennifer (Celine) Liu

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

The Atlantic Building, 950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1404

Lenny Huang

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Xavier Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Jennifer C. Liu

Attorney at Allston & Bird

The Atlantic Building, 950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Ross Ritter Barton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

101 South Tryon Street, Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Xavier M. Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701-2719

Michael A. Oakes

Attorney at Hunton & Williams, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Steven L Wood

Attorney at Hunton & Williams, LLP

2200 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20016

Melissa A. Romanzo

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

Bank Of America Plaza, Suite 3500, 101 South Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28280

 

Court Documents

#58

#57

#56

#55

54 #4

Exhibit D-Telecommunication Systems Inc v Sybase 365 Inc.

54 #3

Exhibit C-BPAI Performance Measures USPTO 2013

54 #2

Exhibit B-Lex Machina - Patent Cases in WDNC filed from 2013-01-01 to 2018-05-31

#54

#51

1 #8

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

1 #7

Exhibit D - USP 9,447,954

1 #6

Exhibit C - USP 9,523,487

1 #5

Exhibit B - USP 9,335,036

1 #4

Exhibit A - USP 9,423,113

1 #3

Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc.

1 #2

Summons - Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Patent Claim Construction Scheduling Order. Opening Claim Construction Brief due by 1/9/2019. Responsive Claim Construction Brief due by 1/23/2019. Reply Claim Construction Brief due by 1/30/2019. Surreply Claim Construction Brief due by 2/6/2019. Markman/Claim Construction Hearing set for 4/1/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/12/18. (mga) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Joint) (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by L G Sourcing, Incorporated, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Romanzo, Melissa) (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) DECLARATION of Jason Kuo re #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by Unity Opto Technology Co, Ltd. Replies due by 6/8/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Barton, Ross) Modified text on 6/4/2018 (tmg). (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) DECLARATION of Lenny Huang re #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by Unity Opto Technology Co Ltd. Replies due by 6/8/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Ex Parte Reexamination Historical Stats Filing Data, #2 Exhibit B-Lex Machina - Patent Cases in WDNC filed from 2013-01-01 to 2018-05-31, #3 Exhibit C-BPAI Performance Measures USPTO 2013, #4 Exhibit D-Telecommunication Systems Inc v Sybase 365 Inc.)(Barton, Ross) Modified text on 6/4/2018 (tmg). (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd.. Replies due by 6/8/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/11/2018. (nvc) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MEMORANDUM in Support re #51 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by L G Sourcing, Incorporated, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A 90/014,104 Reexamination Determination, #3 Exhibit B 90/014,105 Reexamination Determination, #4 Exhibit C 90/014,106 Reexamination Determination, #5 Exhibit D 90/014,107 Reexamination Determination)(Romanzo, Melissa) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Requests of the Asserted Patents by L G Sourcing, Incorporated, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Romanzo, Melissa). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by L G Sourcing, Incorporated.(Romanzo, Melissa) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. L G Sourcing, Inc. served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (Hu, Yitai) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disregard. See #7 . Modified on 1/29/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, L G Sourcing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc.) (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketStandard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. (Hu, Yitai) Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disregard. See #3 . Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against L G Sourcing, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2173673) filed by Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #3 Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc., #4 Exhibit A - USP 9,423,113, #5 Exhibit B - USP 9,335,036, #6 Exhibit C - USP 9,523,487, #7 Exhibit D - USP 9,447,954, #8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Hu, Yitai) Modified on 1/16/2018: Case number. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 5/4/2018.] (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITY OPTO TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where L G Sourcing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Lowe's Home Centers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven L. Wood