This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2018 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 Unity Opto Technology Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd.

Defendants

L G Sourcing, Inc.

Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yitai Hu

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Xavier Brandwajn

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Lenny Huang

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

1950 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Jennifer (Celine) Liu

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

The Atlantic Building, 950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1404

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Gregor

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn S.C.

One East Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 2719

Madison, WI 53701-2719

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Motion to Admit Xavier Brandwajn Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2190500.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#13

(#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants L G Sourcing, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

#10

(#10) Motion to Admit Jennifer (Celine) Liu Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2182045.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Liu, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#9

(#9) Motion to Admit Lenny Huang Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2182044.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Huang, Lenny) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#8

(#8) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. L G Sourcing, Inc. served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (Hu, Yitai) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

#6

(#6) Disregard. See #7 . Modified on 1/29/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

4 #1

Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc.

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, L G Sourcing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc.) (arw) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#3

(#2) Disregard. See #3 . Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

#2

(#2) Disregard. See #3 . Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

1 #8

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

1 #7

Exhibit D USP 9,447,954

1 #6

Exhibit C USP 9,523,487

1 #5

Exhibit B USP 9,335,036

1 #4

Exhibit A USP 9,423,113

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #15 Motion to Admit Xavier Brandwajn Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/13/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion to Admit Xavier Brandwajn Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2190500.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Brandwajn, Xavier) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/9/2018. (voc) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants L G Sourcing, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Gregor, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Motion to Admit Jennifer (Celine) Liu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/30/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion to Admit Lenny Huang Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/30/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to Admit Jennifer (Celine) Liu Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2182045.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Liu, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion to Admit Lenny Huang Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2182044.) by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Huang, Lenny) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. L G Sourcing, Inc. served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (Hu, Yitai) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disregard. See #7 . Modified on 1/29/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, L G Sourcing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc.) (arw) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. (Hu, Yitai) Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disregard. See #3 . Modified on 1/16/2018. (lak) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against L G Sourcing, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2173673) filed by Unity Opto Technology Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #3 Summons - L G Sourcing, Inc., #4 Exhibit A - USP 9,423,113, #5 Exhibit B - USP 9,335,036, #6 Exhibit C - USP 9,523,487, #7 Exhibit D - USP 9,447,954, #8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Hu, Yitai) Modified on 1/16/2018: Case number. (lak) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less