This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 13:49:17 (UTC).

United Van Lines, LLC v. Deming et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 United Van Lines, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Deming. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Van Lines, LLC

Defendants

Sarah Deming

Scott Deming

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Toal

Lauren J Koblitz

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan E. Dornberger

Seth A. Northrop

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)

#38

(#38) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by United Van Lines, LLC filed by United Van Lines, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 23 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by United Van Lines, LLC filed by United Van Lines, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Van Lines, LLC is a litigant