This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/02/2018 at 07:05:20 (UTC).

United Supermarkets, LLC et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 United Supermarkets, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Tyson Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elaine E. Bucklo and Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-06693

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Elaine E. Bucklo

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheney Bros., Inc.

Defendants

SIMMONS PREPARED FOODS, INC.

Harrison Poultry, Inc.

Agri Stats, Inc.

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)

George's, Inc.

Pilgrim's Pride Corporation

Simmons Foods, Inc.

JCG Foods of Alabama,,LLC

Perdue Farms, Inc.

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)

O.K. Industries, Inc.

Koch Foods, Inc.

House of Raeford Farms, Inc.

George's Farms, Inc.

Mountaire Farms, LLC

Foster Farms, LLC

Sanderson Farms, Inc.

Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)

Mountaire Farms, Inc.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Vanek

Attorney at Vanek, Vickers & Masini, P.C.

55 W. Monroe St., #3500

Chicago, IL 60603

Sarah Cortvriend

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.a.

525 Okeechobee Blvd., Suite 1200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Local Rule 40.4 and finding of relatedness to case 16-cv-8637. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/16/2018. (eaa, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Supermarkets, LLC (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cheney Bros., Inc. (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheney Bros., Inc., Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC by Sarah Cortvriend (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (eaa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheney Bros., Inc., Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC by Joseph Michael Vanek (Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC, Cheney Bros., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15021318.(Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Local Rule 40.4 and finding of relatedness to case 16-cv-8637. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/16/2018. (eaa, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Supermarkets, LLC (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cheney Bros., Inc. (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheney Bros., Inc., Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC by Sarah Cortvriend (Cortvriend, Sarah) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (eaa, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (lma, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cheney Bros., Inc., Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC by Joseph Michael Vanek (Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Krispy Krunchy Foods, LLC, United Supermarkets, LLC, Cheney Bros., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15021318.(Vanek, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where George's Farms, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mountaire Farms, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc. is a litigant