This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:57:24 (UTC).

United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC v. Tecnocap LLC

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Tecnocap LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick P. Stamp, Jr and John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC

Defendant

Tecnocap LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy F. Cogan

Attorney at Cassidy, Cogan, Shapell & Voegelin, L.C.

First State Capitol Building, 1413 Eoff Street

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tecnocap LLC. Tecnocap LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Shafer, Bradley) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. (Case associated with lead case 5:18-cv-156) Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/29/18. (lmm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (Cogan, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION. Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. no longer assigned to case Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/14/18. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 7/18/18 Award

1 #2

Exhibit 3/27/18 Award

1 #1

Exhibit CBA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE HALL ARBITRATION AWARD against Tecnocap LLC, filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC.Filing Fee: $400.00 - Receipt Number #0424-2701386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA, #2 Exhibit 3/27/18 Award, #3 Exhibit 7/18/18 Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tecnocap LLC. Tecnocap LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Shafer, Bradley) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Cases associated: Create association to 5:18-cv-00156-JPB. (lmm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. (Case associated with lead case 5:18-cv-156) Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/29/18. (lmm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (Cogan, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION. Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. no longer assigned to case Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/14/18. (lmm) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE HALL ARBITRATION AWARD against Tecnocap LLC, filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC.Filing Fee: $400.00 - Receipt Number #0424-2701386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA, #2 Exhibit 3/27/18 Award, #3 Exhibit 7/18/18 Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tecnocap LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STEEL, PAPER AND FORESTRY, RUBBER, MANUFACTURING, ENERGY, ALLIED INDUSTRIAL AND SERVICE WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, AFL-CIO-CLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy F. Cogan