This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:37:13 (UTC).

United States of America v. Kaur et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Kaur. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paula Xinis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02663

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paula Xinis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United States of America/Internal Revenue Service

United States of America

Defendants

Gagandeep Singh

Mandeep Kaur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Eileen Hoffman Logsdon

Attorney at US Department of Justice

Po Box 227

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorney

Alan J Hoff

Attorney at Sellman Hoff LLC

2201 Old Court Road

Baltimore, MD 21208

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh(Hoff, Alan) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#7

(#7) LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

5 #1

Demand for Jury Trial

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Hoff, Alan) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gagandeep Singh served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mandeep Kaur served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Mandeep Kaur and Gagandeep Singh.(km4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America/Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATUS REPORT by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh(Hoff, Alan) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/15/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mandeep Kaur, Gagandeep Singh. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Hoff, Alan) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gagandeep Singh served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mandeep Kaur served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018.(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Mandeep Kaur and Gagandeep Singh.(km4, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America/Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hoffman Logsdon, Megan) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.