This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2018 at 07:44:00 (UTC).

United States of America v. Ward et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00324

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Brandon Lee Ward

McIntosh County Treasurer

McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners

Alicia Dawn Ward

Oklahoma Tax Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cheryl R. Triplett

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 9/26/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Alicia Dawn Ward (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Treasurer - Served on 9/26/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Lee Ward (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Promissory Note for $130,000

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brandon Lee Ward - Served on 11/10/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Mortgage dated 9/9/09

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Oklahoma Tax Commission Lien

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Tax Commission (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Tax Commission - Served on 9/28/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Promissory Note for $15,000

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Verification of United States

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Treasurer (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Alicia Dawn Ward - Served on 10/17/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Alicia Dawn Ward, Brandon Lee Ward by United States of America (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brandon Lee Ward - Served on 11/10/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Alicia Dawn Ward - Served on 10/17/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Oklahoma Tax Commission - Served on 9/28/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Treasurer - Served on 9/26/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners - Served on 9/26/2018. by United States of America (Triplett, Cheryl) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Treasurer (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Oklahoma Tax Commission (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Lee Ward (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Alicia Dawn Ward (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against McIntosh County Board of County Commissioners, McIntosh County Treasurer, Oklahoma Tax Commission, Alicia Dawn Ward, Brandon Lee Ward by United States of America (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.