This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2018 at 07:25:05 (UTC).

United States of America v. Vera et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Vera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray H Miller and Nancy K Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-03032

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

Referral Judge

Nancy K Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Jesus Vera

Josefina B Vera

Ignacio T Vera

Experanza L Vera

Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie M Page

Attorney at Dept of Justice

717 N Harwood, Ste 400

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by United States of America, filed.(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson for full pretrial management.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/31/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

2 #4

Summons to Experanza L. Vera

2 #3

Summons to Jesus Vera

2 #2

Summons to Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd.

2 #1

Summons to Josefina B. Vera

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., Experanza L Vera, Ignacio T Vera, Jesus Vera, Josefina B Vera, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Josefina B. Vera, #2 Summons to Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., #3 Summons to Jesus Vera, #4 Summons to Experanza L. Vera)(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., Experanza L Vera, Ignacio T Vera, Jesus Vera, Josefina B Vera filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by United States of America, filed.(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nancy K Johnson for full pretrial management.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 12/31/2018(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., Experanza L Vera, Ignacio T Vera, Jesus Vera, Josefina B Vera, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Josefina B. Vera, #2 Summons to Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., #3 Summons to Jesus Vera, #4 Summons to Experanza L. Vera)(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Premier Plastering Supply, Ltd., Experanza L Vera, Ignacio T Vera, Jesus Vera, Josefina B Vera filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Page, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less