This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 07:20:27 (UTC).

United States of America v. St. Marys Rural Housing, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against St Marys Rural Housing, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A. Crow and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-04138

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Crow

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

John and Jane Doe #5

John and Jane Doe #4

John and Jane Doe #1

John and Jane Doe #17

John and Jane Doe #15

John and Jane Doe #10

John and Jane Doe #13

St. Marys Rural Housing, L.P.

John and Jane Doe #9

John and Jane Doe #8

John and Jane Doe #11

John and Jane Doe #7

John and Jane Doe #16

John and Jane Doe #6

John and Jane Doe #3

John and Jane Doe #14

John and Jane Doe #2

John and Jane Doe #18

John and Jane Doe #12

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tanya S. Wilson

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Topeka

290 Us Courthouse, 444 Se Quincy

Topeka, KS 66683-3592

 

Court Documents

3 #3

Exhibit C - Agreement

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

3 #2

Exhibit B - Mortgage

3 #1

Exhibit A - Note

1 #3

Exhibit C - Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Mortgage

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Note

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to John and Jane Doe #1, John and Jane Doe #10, John and Jane Doe #11, John and Jane Doe #12, John and Jane Doe #13, John and Jane Doe #14, John and Jane Doe #15, John and Jane Doe #16, John and Jane Doe #17, John and Jane Doe #18, John and Jane Doe #2, John and Jane Doe #3, John and Jane Doe #4, John and Jane Doe #5, John and Jane Doe #6, John and Jane Doe #7, John and Jane Doe #8, John and Jane Doe #9. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to St. Marys Rural Housing, L.P.. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Wilson, Tanya) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.