This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:29:46 (UTC).

United States of America v. Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730 et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Springfield Armory Inc , 45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No GM475730. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01320

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Springfield Armory Inc., .45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730

One Hundred and Thirty-One Rounds of .45 Caliber Ammunition

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - STL

111 S. Tenth St., 20Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Levell Littleton, Type of return 8/16/20148, Mailed Certified, Cert No: 9414816902246689801851, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Rachel Carter, 8/16/2018 Mailed Certified, Cert No 941486902246689801820 (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#3

(#3) MARSHAL Return Executed party served - One Hundred & Thirtv-One Rounds of.45 Caliber Ammunition, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means(KKS) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#2

(#2) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Springfield Armory Inc..45 Cal. Pistol, Serial No. GM 475730, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES 08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means (KKS) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #4

Warrant For Assorted Ammunition

1 #3

Warrant For Springfield Armory Pistol

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For Springfield Armory Pistol, #4 Warrant For Assorted Ammunition)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Levell Littleton, Type of return 8/16/20148, Mailed Certified, Cert No: 9414816902246689801851, (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Rachel Carter, 8/16/2018 Mailed Certified, Cert No 941486902246689801820 (CLO) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Publication. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MARSHAL Return Executed party served - One Hundred & Thirtv-One Rounds of.45 Caliber Ammunition, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means(KKS) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MARSHAL Return Executed party served Springfield Armory Inc..45 Cal. Pistol, Serial No. GM 475730, Type of return Complaint & Warrant, ASSET IN CUSTODY OF ATF - BUREAU of ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES 08/16/2018 - Served and 08/23/2018 accepted by Nicole D. Hover with ATF via Electronic Means (KKS) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MFG) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantOne Hundred and Thirty-One Rounds of.45 Caliber Ammunition. (MFG) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantSpringfield Armory Inc.,.45 Caliber Pistol, Serial No. GM475730. (MFG) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant For Springfield Armory Pistol, #4 Warrant For Assorted Ammunition)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.