This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:03:27 (UTC).

United States of America v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roanne L. Mann and Carol Bagley Amon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04888

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

Presiding Judge

Carol Bagley Amon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

New York City Department of Finance

U.S. Bank National Association

The Bank of New York Mellon Corp.

New York City Department of Social Services

372 Parkside Avenue, Inc.

Yusef R. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah T. Mayhew

Attorney at Dept. of Justice - Tax Division

Po Box 55, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Peter Andrew Swift

Attorney at Sandelands Eyet LLP

1545 Us Highway 206 Suite 304

Bedminster, NJ 07921

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Yusef R. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Summons Smith as Trustee of the James Harry Smith Separate Property Tru

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Smith as Trustee of the James Harry Smith Separate Property Trust) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 11/14/2018 @ 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/25/2018. (Kelson, Lise) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Kelson, Lise). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

7 #1

Declaration of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Swift on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service) (Swift, Peter) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

6 #1

Declaration of Service

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service) (Swift, Peter) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

5 #5

US Bank Nat. Association Summons

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Yusef R. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Smith as Trustee of the James Harry Smith Separate Property Trust) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 11/14/2018 @ 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 13C South, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York before Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 9/25/2018. (Kelson, Lise) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Kelson, Lise). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Andrew Swift on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service) (Swift, Peter) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service) (Swift, Peter) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to 372 Parkside Avenue, Inc., New York City Department of Finance, New York City Department of Social Services, Yusef R. Smith, The Bank of New York Mellon Corp., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 NYC Dept of Social Services Summons, #2 NYC Dept of Finance Summons, #3 Bank of NY Mellon Corp Summons, #4 372 Parkside Avenue, Inc. Summons, #5 US Bank Nat. Association Summons) (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) (Mayhew, Sarah) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.