This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:31:38 (UTC).

United States of America v. Schunk et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Schunk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael D. Nelson and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-03117

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael D. Nelson

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Tamera Pickel

Taren Hoffman

Clayton Heinrich

LaRae Schunk

Nebraska Department of Revenue

Ronald Heinrich

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin M. Shoemaker

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE - TAX DIVISION

P.O. Box 7238, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Amber L. Coulter

Attorney at NEBRASKA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

P.O. Box 94818

Lincoln, NE 68509-4818

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Clayton Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#6

(#6) Disclaimer ANSWER to Complaint Disclaimer by Nebraska Department of Revenue (Coulter, Amber) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon (Coulter, Amber) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Tamera Pickel. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; LaRae Schunk. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ronald Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; Taren Hoffman. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Martin M. Shoemaker on behalf of United States of America(Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Clayton Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclaimer ANSWER to Complaint Disclaimer by Nebraska Department of Revenue (Coulter, Amber) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon (Coulter, Amber) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Tamera Pickel. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; LaRae Schunk. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ronald Heinrich. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018; Taren Hoffman. Waiver sent on 8/29/2018. (Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • (#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Martin M. Shoemaker on behalf of United States of America(Shoemaker, Martin) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.