This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2018 at 07:03:35 (UTC).

United States of America v. Sandiego et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Sandiego. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05835

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Gary Sandiego

G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Tennyson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Decatorsmith

Attorney at Tax Clinic, Law Office At Chicago-Kent College Of Law

565 Adams, Suite 600

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego. (Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego(Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego by Jonathan Decatorsmith (Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP due 11/5/2018. The Report must conform to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The form of the Report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd. on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Gary Sandiego on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Steven Tennyson (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego. (Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego(Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego by Jonathan Decatorsmith (Decatorsmith, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP due 11/5/2018. The Report must conform to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The form of the Report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd. on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Gary Sandiego on 9/2/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants G. Sandiego & Associates Ltd., Gary Sandiego (jn, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (dal, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Steven Tennyson (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Tennyson, Steven) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.