This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2019 at 08:04:54 (UTC).

United States of America v. Real Property Located at 15 Lenihan Lane, East Greenwich, RI

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Real Property Located at 15 Lenihan Lane, East Greenwich, RI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00634

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust

Monique N. Brady

Thomas F. Brady

Defendant

Real Property Located at 15 Lenihan Lane, East Greenwich, RI

Trustee

Charles A. Pisaturo, Jr.

Providence, RI 02907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zachary A. Cunha

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

50 Kennedy Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Claimant Attorneys

Joseph K. Scully

Attorney at Day Pitney LLP

242 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

J. Richard Ratcliffe

Attorney at Ratcliffe Harten Galamaga LLP

40 Westminster Street, Suite 700, 331-3400, Fax: 331-3440

Providence, RI 02903

Trustee Attorney

Charles A. Pisaturo, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles A. Pisaturo, Jr.

1055 Elmwood Ave., 274-3800, Fax: 751-6786

Providence, RI 02907

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STIPULATION re #13 Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Stay on Consent of All Parties filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#16

(#16) CLAIM Verified by U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#15

(#15) First MOTION for an Extension of Time Motion to Extend Time In Which To File Verified Claim filed by U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Responses due by 1/7/2019. (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph K. Scully on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION STAYING CASE - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Charles A. Pisaturo, Jr..(Pisaturo, Charles) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Ratcliffe on behalf of Thomas F. Brady (Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#3

(#3) WRIT OF ENTRY - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#2

TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Entry- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #17 Stipulation and continuing stay - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/4/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION re #13 Order Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Stay on Consent of All Parties filed by United States of America. (Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLAIM Verified by U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time; Reset Deadlines: U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust Verified Claim due 1/4/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) First MOTION for an Extension of Time Motion to Extend Time In Which To File Verified Claim filed by U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Responses due by 1/7/2019. (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph K. Scully on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Scully, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION STAYING CASE - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/20/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION to Stay this action pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(g)(1) and (2), on agreement of the United States and all claimants who have appeared to date filed by United States of America. Responses due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Charles A. Pisaturo, Jr..(Pisaturo, Charles) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM Interest in Real Property by Monique N. Brady. (Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Ratcliffe on behalf of Thomas F. Brady (Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Ratcliffe on behalf of Monique N. Brady, Thomas F. Brady (Ratcliffe, J.) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WRIT OF ENTRY - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ of Entry- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Entry)(Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunha, Zachary) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less