This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2018 at 06:12:07 (UTC).

United States of America v. Raddatz, Randall et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Raddatz, Randall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Countryside Cooperative

First National Community Bank

Deere Credit, Inc.

Sheffield Financial

David J. Grevich

Dennis Raddatz

Randall L. Raddatz

Deere & Company

Mary Beth Raddatz

CNH Industrial Capital America, LLC

The Cooperative Finance Association, Inc.

Ashley Raddatz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barbara L Oswald

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

222 West Washington Avenue, Suite 700

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

1 #15

Exhibit N - 02.21.2017 Notice of Repossession

1 #14

Exhibit M - 01.19.2017 Notice of Acceleration

1 #13

Exhibit L - 10.04.2012 Severance Agreement

1 #12

Exhibit K - 09.17.2012 Financing Statement

1 #11

Exhibit J - 10.03.2012 Financing Statement Amendment

1 #10

Exhibit I - 10.18.2012 Promissory Note and Security Agreement

1 #9

Exhibit H - 02.03.2017 Notice of Acceleration

1 #8

Exhibit G - 02.02.2015 Mortgage

1 #7

Exhibit F - 01.13.2012 Financing Statement

1 #6

Exhibit E - 01.29.2015 Financing Statement Amendment

1 #4

Exhibit C - 01.29.2015 Security Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit B - 12.06.2012 Promissory Note

1 #2

Exhibit A - 01.29.2015 Promissory Note

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 01.29.2015 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 12.06.2012 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 01.29.2015 Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - 01.29.2015 Financing Statement, #6 Exhibit E - 01.29.2015 Financing Statement Amendment, #7 Exhibit F - 01.13.2012 Financing Statement, #8 Exhibit G - 02.02.2015 Mortgage, #9 Exhibit H - 02.03.2017 Notice of Acceleration, #10 Exhibit I - 10.18.2012 Promissory Note and Security Agreement, #11 Exhibit J - 10.03.2012 Financing Statement Amendment, #12 Exhibit K - 09.17.2012 Financing Statement, #13 Exhibit L - 10.04.2012 Severance Agreement, #14 Exhibit M - 01.19.2017 Notice of Acceleration, #15 Exhibit N - 02.21.2017 Notice of Repossession) (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 01.29.2015 Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B - 12.06.2012 Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C - 01.29.2015 Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - 01.29.2015 Financing Statement, #6 Exhibit E - 01.29.2015 Financing Statement Amendment, #7 Exhibit F - 01.13.2012 Financing Statement, #8 Exhibit G - 02.02.2015 Mortgage, #9 Exhibit H - 02.03.2017 Notice of Acceleration, #10 Exhibit I - 10.18.2012 Promissory Note and Security Agreement, #11 Exhibit J - 10.03.2012 Financing Statement Amendment, #12 Exhibit K - 09.17.2012 Financing Statement, #13 Exhibit L - 10.04.2012 Severance Agreement, #14 Exhibit M - 01.19.2017 Notice of Acceleration, #15 Exhibit N - 02.21.2017 Notice of Repossession) (Oswald, Barbara) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less