This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:23:09 (UTC).

United States of America v. Pelfrey et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 United States of America filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Pelfrey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Joe Heaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00945

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Scott L. Palk

Joe Heaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Rosemarie Pelfrey

Pelfrey Investments Company LLC

Omega Enterprises LLC

John/Jane Doe

Rosemarie Pelfrey as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002 doing business as Pelfrey Rentals

Rosemarie Pelfrey as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002 doing business as Pelfrey Rentals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J Card

Attorney at US Attorney's Office-OKC

210 W Park Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Lauren Marks

Attorney at US Dept of Justice Civil Rights Division-DC

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Rm 4928 Phb

Washington, DC 20530

Tamica H Daniel

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - Civil Rights Division DC

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw - Nwb

Washington, DC 20530

Ronald R Gallegos

Attorney at US Attorney's Office-OKC

210 W Park Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Summons Issued Electronically as to Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Ray Pelfrey), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (nv) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Pelfrey), and against Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America.(Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002) waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. Pelfrey Investments Company LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/1/2018. (md) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Tamica H Daniel on behalf of United States of America (Daniel, Tamica) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Card on behalf of United States of America (Card, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by United States of America (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Marks on behalf of United States of America (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (ac) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Issued Electronically as to Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Ray Pelfrey), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (nv) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Walter Pelfrey), and against Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America.(Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Rosemarie Pelfrey. Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002) waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. Pelfrey Investments Company LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 10/1/2018. (md) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Tamica H Daniel on behalf of United States of America (Daniel, Tamica) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J Card on behalf of United States of America (Card, Daniel) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by United States of America (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren Marks on behalf of United States of America (Marks, Lauren) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC. (ac) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John/Jane Doe, Omega Enterprises LLC, Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the W. Ray Pelfrey Revocable Trust Dated March 1, 2002), Rosemarie Pelfrey(as Trustee of the Rosemarie Pelfrey Revocable Trust dated March 1, 2002), Pelfrey Investments Company LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald R Gallegos(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Card