This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 08:00:32 (UTC).

United States of America v. O'Toole, Shannon et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against O'Toole, Shannon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00592

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Mark M. Leahy

Shannon O'Toole

Nadine E. Leahy

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Bell Mortgage

Howard Quinlan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Lindgren

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division

P.O. Box 7238, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Robert McBride

Attorney at Winthrop & Weinstine, P.A.

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 3500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Summons - Shannon O'Toole

1 #5

Summons - Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

#10

(#10) Text of Proposed Order re: #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Shannon O'Toole. Shannon O'Toole waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Robert McBride for Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Bell Mortgage, Mark M. Leahy, Nadine E. Leahy, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Howard Quinlan, #2 Summons Nadine E. Leahy, #3 Summons Mark M. Leahy, #4 Summons Nationstar Mortgage LLC, #5 Summons Bell Mortgage) (voc) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #6

Summons - Bell Mortgage

2 #5

Summons Bell Mortgage

1 #2

Summons - Howard Quinlan

2 #2

Summons Nadine E. Leahy

2 #4

Summons Nationstar Mortgage LLC

2 #1

Summons Howard Quinlan

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Howard Quinlan. Howard Quinlan waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

2 #3

Summons Mark M. Leahy

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Nadine E. Leahy. Nadine E. Leahy waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#9

(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018: Third page is blank. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Mark M. Leahy. Mark M. Leahy waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Nationstar Mortgage LLC waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Shannon O'Toole and Howard Quinlan answer due 10/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/19/2018. (arw) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Text of Proposed Order re: #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018: Third page is blank. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Robert McBride for Defendants Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (McBride, Matthew) Modified on 9/20/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Shannon O'Toole. Shannon O'Toole waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Howard Quinlan. Howard Quinlan waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Nationstar Mortgage LLC waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Nadine E. Leahy. Nadine E. Leahy waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Mark M. Leahy. Mark M. Leahy waiver sent on 8/2/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Bell Mortgage, Mark M. Leahy, Nadine E. Leahy, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Shannon O'Toole, Howard Quinlan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Howard Quinlan, #2 Summons Nadine E. Leahy, #3 Summons Mark M. Leahy, #4 Summons Nationstar Mortgage LLC, #5 Summons Bell Mortgage) (voc) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Shannon O'Toole, #2 Summons - Howard Quinlan, #3 Summons - Nadine Leahy, #4 Summons - Mark Leahy, #5 Summons - Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, #6 Summons - Bell Mortgage, #7 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lindgren, Erin) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.