This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2018 at 07:39:08 (UTC).

United States of America v. One 2015 Porsche MAC Utility, VIN WP1AB2A5XFLB56332, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against One 2015 Porsche MAC Utility, VIN WP1AB2A5XFLB56332, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02679

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Rigoberto Galindo

Calvin Galindo-Gonzalez

Defendant

One 2015 Porsche MAC Utility, VIN WP1AB2A5XFLB56332, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher E. Cotten

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Calvin Galindo-Gonzalez. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Rigoberto Galindo. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

Summons

#6

(#6) NOTICE by United States of America Three (3) summons to be issued (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Cotten, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER in REM. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

4 #1

Supplement Order for Warrant In REM

#4

(#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/01/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Additional attachment(s): #1 Supplement Order for Warrant In REM) (wrh). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A- Affidavit

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE against One 2015 Porsche MAC Utility, VIN WP1AB2A5XFLB56332, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotten, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Calvin Galindo-Gonzalez. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Rigoberto Galindo. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by United States of America Three (3) summons to be issued (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Cotten, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER in REM. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER FOR WARRANT FOR ARREST OF PROPERTY. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/01/2018. (Fowlkes, John) (Additional attachment(s): #1 Supplement Order for Warrant In REM) (wrh). (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE against One 2015 Porsche MAC Utility, VIN WP1AB2A5XFLB56332, with All Appurtenances and Attachments Thereon, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotten, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less