This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2018 at 07:49:10 (UTC).

United States of America v. Olenick et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Olenick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

United States of America

Counter Plaintiffs and Defendants

M. Rae Nadler-Olenick

Austin, TX 78713

Walter Olenick

Austin, TX 78713

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Gary W. Wright

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 600

San Antonio, TX 78216

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, filed by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick.(dm) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States of America, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Walter Olenick, Defendant M. Rae Nadler-Olenick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#8

(#8) RULE 12 MOTIONS by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. M. Rae Nadler-Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Walter Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#5

(#5) Letter/Correspondence from M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (afd) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #14

Exhibit

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America, filed by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick.(dm) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States of America, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Walter Olenick, Defendant M. Rae Nadler-Olenick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gary) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 12 MOTIONS by M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. M. Rae Nadler-Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Walter Olenick served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Wright, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter/Correspondence from M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (dm) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to M. Rae Nadler-Olenick, Walter Olenick. (afd) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Wright, Gary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE , filed by The United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Wright, Gary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2018 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.