This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/25/2020 at 08:41:02 (UTC).

United States of America v. North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2016 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-00820

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

North Georgia Electric Membership Corporation

Huntington Ingalls Inc.

Harsco Corp.

American Biltrite Inc.

North Carolina State University

E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Grand Haven Board of Light and Power

Imerys Fused Minerals Greeneville, Inc.

Buist Electric Inc.

Holladay Property Services Midwest, Inc.

Occidental Chemical Corporation

City of Winston-Salem

Environmental Protection Services, Inc.

United States Steel Corporation

Orbital ATK, Inc.

Palmetto Electric Cooperative, Inc.

Green Mountain Power, Inc.

Delaware Electric Cooperative, Inc.

Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc.

154 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori B. Jonas

Attorney at U. S. Dept. of Justice

P. O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

Mark E. Sabath

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P. O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

G. Norman Acker, III

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office - EDNC

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

Defendant Attorneys

David E. Fox

Attorney at Moore & Van Allen, PLLC

P. O. Box 13706, 430 Davis Dr.

Research Triangle Park, NC 27709

Keith Harrison Johnson

Attorney at Poyner Spruill LLP

301 Fayetteville St., Suite 1900, P. O. Box 1801

Raleigh, NC 27601

Other Attorneys

Neil A. Riemann

Attorney at Penry Riemann PLLC

1330 Saint Mary'S St., Suite 260

Raleigh, NC 27605

Curtis J. Shipley

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752, Zip Code 27402, 300 N. Greene Street, Suite 800

Greensboro, NC 27401

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #2

Affidavit of William A. White

13 #1

Affidavit of Keith H. Johnson

#13

12 #3

Text of Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit B - Poyner Spruill LLP Invoice

12 #1

Exhibit A - Moore & Van Allen PLLC Invoice

#12

#11

10 #1

Appendices A through G

#10

9 #2

Declaration of Hilary M. Thornton

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

#8

#7

#6

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Award of Common Defense Costs - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/3/2017. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 02/03/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance filed by David E. Fox on behalf of City of Dover, Delaware Electric Cooperative, Inc., Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., North Carolina State University, Nucor Corporation, Seabrook Enterprises, Inc., The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill, Timken US LLC, Town of Blackstone, Wartburg College. (Fox, David) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION for Award of Common Defense Costs filed by Aerojet Rocketdyne Holdings, Inc., Buist Electric Inc., City of Monroe, City of Winston-Salem, FABRI-KAL Corporation, Fluidyne Engineering Corp., Kelly Electric, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Town of Louisburg, Town of Tarboro., William Peace University. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Keith H. Johnson, #2 Affidavit of William A. White) (Johnson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Award of Common Defense Costs filed by Aerojet Rocketdyne Holdings, Inc., Buist Electric Inc., City of Monroe, City of Winston-Salem, FABRI-KAL Corporation, Fluidyne Engineering Corp., Kelly Electric, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Town of Louisburg, Town of Tarboro., William Peace University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moore & Van Allen PLLC Invoice, #2 Exhibit B - Poyner Spruill LLP Invoice, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Johnson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Keith Harrison Johnson on behalf of Aerojet Rocketdyne Holdings, Inc., Buist Electric Inc., City of Monroe, City of Winston-Salem, FABRI-KAL Corporation, Fluidyne Engineering Corp., Kelly Electric, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Rutherford Electric Membership Corporation, Town of Louisburg, Town of Tarboro., William Peace University. (Johnson, Keith) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Appendices A through G) (Baker, C.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan - #9 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment (Unopposed). (Baker, C.) (Entered: 11/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding #9 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment - Counsel is reminded that a Memorandum in Support should be filed as a separate entry using event codes located under 'Motions and Related Filings: Responses and Replies'. In future filings, be sure to file each pleading separately and link the memorandum to the underlying motion. No need to refile at this time. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 11/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment (Unopposed) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Hilary M. Thornton) (Sabath, Mark) (Entered: 11/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Neil A. Riemann on behalf of Mass. Electric Construction Co. (Riemann, Neil) (Entered: 10/14/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. (Shipley, Curtis) (Entered: 10/10/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by G. Norman Acker, III on behalf of United States of America. (Acker, G.) (Entered: 09/28/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Mark E. Sabath on behalf of United States of America. (Sabath, Mark) (Entered: 09/26/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORRECTED NOTICE of Settlement - Corrected Notice of Lodging (Corrected Only to Replace Inadvertently Attached Certificate of Service) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Appendices A-G to Consent Decree) (Jonas, Lori) (Entered: 09/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Lori B. Jonas on behalf of United States of America. (Jonas, Lori) (Entered: 09/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Felder, J) (Entered: 09/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *DOCUMENT CORRECTED AND REFILED AT DOCKET ENTRY #4 * - NOTICE of Settlement - Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Appendix A-G to the Consent Decree) (Jonas, Lori) Modified on 9/23/2016 to insert refiling information. (Baker, C.) (Entered: 09/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jonas, Lori) (Entered: 09/22/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less